THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 03:06:24 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1974
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: London Health Sciences Centre
Victoria Campus E2 123
800 Commissioners Road East
London Ontario N6A 5W9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 667-6644
Fax: (519) 667-6573

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Vascular Surgery
Effective: 26 Nov 1984
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
General Surgery
Effective: 01 Jan 1979
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Vascular Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 26 1984
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 01 1979
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre London
HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Gaetano DeRose Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Mar 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. G. DeRose (CPSO#: 27512 )
Business Address: London Health Sciences Centre
Victoria Campus E2 123
800 Commissioners Road East
London Ontario N6A 5W9
(519) 667-6644

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: London Health Sciences Centre
Victoria Campus E2 123
800 Commissioners Road East
London Ontario N6A 5W9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 667-6644
Fax: (519) 667-6573

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Vascular Surgery
Effective: 26 Nov 1984
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
General Surgery
Effective: 01 Jan 1979
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Vascular Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 26 1984
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 01 1979
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre London
HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Gaetano DeRose Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Mar 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. G. DeRose (CPSO#: 27512 )
Business Address: London Health Sciences Centre
Victoria Campus E2 123
800 Commissioners Road East
London Ontario N6A 5W9
(519) 667-6644

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GAETANO DEROSE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DEROSE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GAETANO DEROSE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DEROSE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1974

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 1975
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1974
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Jul 1975

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1974