THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 03:42:32 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1974
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 195 Marine Drive
Windsor Ontario N8N 4K1
Business Email: [email protected]
Phone: 519-258-0718
Fax: 519-258-8936

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Endocrinology and Metabolism
Effective: 09 Sep 1988
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 16 Jun 1988
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Endocrinology and Metabolism
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 09 1988
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 16 1988
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hotel Dieu Grace Healthcare Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital Windsor
HOSPITAL: Hotel Dieu Grace Healthcare
LOCATION: Windsor

HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus
LOCATION: Windsor

HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital
LOCATION: Windsor

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Robert J. Wilson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Jun 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Wilson (CPSO#: 27571 )
Business Address: 195 Marine Drive
Windsor Ontario N8N 4K1
519-258-0718

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 195 Marine Drive
Windsor Ontario N8N 4K1
Business Email: [email protected]
Phone: 519-258-0718
Fax: 519-258-8936

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Endocrinology and Metabolism
Effective: 09 Sep 1988
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 16 Jun 1988
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Endocrinology and Metabolism
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 09 1988
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 16 1988
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hotel Dieu Grace Healthcare Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital Windsor
HOSPITAL: Hotel Dieu Grace Healthcare
LOCATION: Windsor

HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus
LOCATION: Windsor

HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital
LOCATION: Windsor

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Robert J. Wilson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Jun 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Wilson (CPSO#: 27571 )
Business Address: 195 Marine Drive
Windsor Ontario N8N 4K1
519-258-0718

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ROBERT JAMES WILSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WILSON is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ROBERT JAMES WILSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WILSON is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1974

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jul 1975
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jul 1975