THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:50:31 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1974
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, GREEK

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: London Health Sciences Center
Victoria Hospital- Fertility Clinic
Zone E, E3-619
800 Commissioners Road East
London Ontario N6A 5W9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 646-6104
Fax: (519) 646-6345

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 17 Nov 1978
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 17 1978
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph Health Care London - Mental Health London
London Health Sciences Centre London
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
HOSPITAL: St Joseph Health Care London - Mental Health
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. George A. Vilos Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Jun 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Vilos (CPSO#: 27653 )
Business Address: London Health Sciences Centre
Victoria Hospital - Fertility Clinic
800 Commissioners Road East
Zone E, E3-619
London Ontario N6A 5W9
(519) 646-6104

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, GREEK
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: London Health Sciences Center
Victoria Hospital- Fertility Clinic
Zone E, E3-619
800 Commissioners Road East
London Ontario N6A 5W9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 646-6104
Fax: (519) 646-6345

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 17 Nov 1978
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 17 1978
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph Health Care London - Mental Health London
London Health Sciences Centre London
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
HOSPITAL: St Joseph Health Care London - Mental Health
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. George A. Vilos Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Jun 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Vilos (CPSO#: 27653 )
Business Address: London Health Sciences Centre
Victoria Hospital - Fertility Clinic
800 Commissioners Road East
Zone E, E3-619
London Ontario N6A 5W9
(519) 646-6104

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GEORGE ANGELOS VILOS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VILOS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GEORGE ANGELOS VILOS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VILOS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1974

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Jul 1975
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1974
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 31 Jul 1975

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Jun 1974