THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:50:28 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of the West Indies, 1969
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2125 Wyecroft Road
Suite 4
Oakville Ontario L6L 5L7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 465-9229
Fax: (905) 465-3883

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 11 Mar 1975
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Mar 11 1975
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Records Management Ltd
Unit 13
1 High Meadow Place
Toronto, ON M9L 0A3
Website: www.recordsregistry.ca
Tel: 1-800-775-0093
Fax: (647) 933 2904
Date Received: 25 Jul 2014

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Cayman Islands
Guyana
Jamaica

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: TREVOR SEATON MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 Jun 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Seaton (CPSO#: 27810 )
Business Address: 4-2125 Wyecroft Rd
Oakville ON L6L 5L7
905-465-9229

Corporation Name: Trevor Seaton Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 13 Feb 2022

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of the West Indies, 1969

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2125 Wyecroft Road
Suite 4
Oakville Ontario L6L 5L7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 465-9229
Fax: (905) 465-3883

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 11 Mar 1975
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Mar 11 1975
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Records Management Ltd
Unit 13
1 High Meadow Place
Toronto, ON M9L 0A3
Website: www.recordsregistry.ca
Tel: 1-800-775-0093
Fax: (647) 933 2904
Date Received: 25 Jul 2014

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Cayman Islands
Guyana
Jamaica

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: TREVOR SEATON MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 Jun 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Seaton (CPSO#: 27810 )
Business Address: 4-2125 Wyecroft Rd
Oakville ON L6L 5L7
905-465-9229

Corporation Name: Trevor Seaton Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 13 Feb 2022

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. TREVOR LEROY SEATON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SEATON is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. TREVOR LEROY SEATON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SEATON is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of the West Indies, 1969

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Sep 1975
Transfer of class of registration to: Institutional - Hospital Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Apr 1975
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1971
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Sep 1975

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Institutional - Hospital Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Apr 1975

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1971