THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:51:34 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1975
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, GUJARATI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Arbor Trace Alzheimers Special Care
120 Chelton Rd
London Ontario N5M 0C9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 681-0002
Fax: (519) 681-0004

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Yasmin Mussani Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Feb 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. Y. Mussani (CPSO#: 28248 )
Business Address: 120 Chelton Road
London Ontario N5M 0C9

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, GUJARATI
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Arbor Trace Alzheimers Special Care
120 Chelton Rd
London Ontario N5M 0C9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 681-0002
Fax: (519) 681-0004

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Yasmin Mussani Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Feb 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. Y. Mussani (CPSO#: 28248 )
Business Address: 120 Chelton Road
London Ontario N5M 0C9

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. YASMIN MUSSANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MUSSANI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. YASMIN MUSSANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MUSSANI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1975

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Oct 2019
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 08 Jun 2018
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1976
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1975
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Oct 2019

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Jun 2018
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 08 Jun 2018

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Jun 1976

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Jun 1975