THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 03:55:09 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1975
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 03 May 2010
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 03 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. A. Teplinsky Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Nov 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Teplinsky (CPSO#: 28279 )
Business Address: Suite 100
1333 Neilson Road
Scarborough Ontario M1B 4Y9
(416) 291-7719

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 03 May 2010
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 03 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. A. Teplinsky Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Nov 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Teplinsky (CPSO#: 28279 )
Business Address: Suite 100
1333 Neilson Road
Scarborough Ontario M1B 4Y9
(416) 291-7719

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1975

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 1976
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1975

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Jun 1976

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Jun 1975