THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:52:54 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1975
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Baycrest Centre For Geriatric Care
Kimel Family Building, Room 656
3560 Bathurst Street
Toronto Ontario M6A 2E1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 785-2500
Extension: 2444
Fax: (416) 785-2484

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurology
Effective: 24 Nov 1980
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neurology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 24 1980
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Baycrest Hospital Toronto
Sinai Health System Toronto
HOSPITAL: Baycrest Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Morris Freedman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Jul 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Freedman (CPSO#: 28334 )
Business Address: Baycrest Centre for Geriatric Care
Brain Health Centre, Room 656
3560 Bathurst Street
Toronto Ontario M6A 2E1
(416) 784-2500 Extn: 2400

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Baycrest Centre For Geriatric Care
Kimel Family Building, Room 656
3560 Bathurst Street
Toronto Ontario M6A 2E1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 785-2500
Extension: 2444
Fax: (416) 785-2484

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurology
Effective: 24 Nov 1980
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neurology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 24 1980
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Baycrest Hospital Toronto
Sinai Health System Toronto
HOSPITAL: Baycrest Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Morris Freedman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Jul 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Freedman (CPSO#: 28334 )
Business Address: Baycrest Centre for Geriatric Care
Brain Health Centre, Room 656
3560 Bathurst Street
Toronto Ontario M6A 2E1
(416) 784-2500 Extn: 2400

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MORRIS FREEDMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FREEDMAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MORRIS FREEDMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FREEDMAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1975

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Sep 1978
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 25 May 1978
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 1976
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1975
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Sep 1978

DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 25 May 1978

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Jun 1976

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Jun 1975