THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 04:07:54 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Nishtar Medical College, 1971
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1985
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1985
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kundi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Dec 2005
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Kundi (CPSO#: 28482 ) Dr. K. Kundi (CPSO#: 33687 )
Business Address: 5 Plymouth Road
Welland Ontario L3B 3C4

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI
Medical School: Nishtar Medical College, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1985
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1985
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kundi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Dec 2005
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Kundi (CPSO#: 28482 ) Dr. K. Kundi (CPSO#: 33687 )
Business Address: 5 Plymouth Road
Welland Ontario L3B 3C4

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Member
Effective Date: 26 Feb 2024
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Pran Jivan Kundi to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective February 26th, 2024:
 
A College investigation was conducted into whether Dr. Kundi’s engaged in professional misconduct. During the investigation, Dr. Kundi resigned from the College and has agreed never to apply or reapply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction.
 

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Member
Effective Date: 26 Feb 2024
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Pran Jivan Kundi to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective February 26th, 2024:
 
A College investigation was conducted into whether Dr. Kundi’s engaged in professional misconduct. During the investigation, Dr. Kundi resigned from the College and has agreed never to apply or reapply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction.
 

Training

Medical School: Nishtar Medical College, 1971

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 26 Feb 2024
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 1976
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 26 Feb 2024

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Jul 1976