THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 03:22:53 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1975
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CANTONESE

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: PH5-208 Queens Quay West
Toronto Ontario M5J 2Y5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 221-3861
Fax: (855) 817-5991

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1985
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1985
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Frances Tung Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Sep 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. F. Tung (CPSO#: 28530 )
Business Address: 26 Dalhousie Street
Toronto Ontario M5B 2A5
(416) 221-3861
Business Address: Penthouse 5
208 Queens Quay West
Toronto Ontario M5J 2Y5
(416) 221-3861
Business Address: 410 - 1366 Yonge Street
Toronto Ontario M4T 3A7
(416) 221-3861

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CANTONESE
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: PH5-208 Queens Quay West
Toronto Ontario M5J 2Y5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 221-3861
Fax: (855) 817-5991

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1985
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1985
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Frances Tung Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Sep 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. F. Tung (CPSO#: 28530 )
Business Address: 26 Dalhousie Street
Toronto Ontario M5B 2A5
(416) 221-3861
Business Address: Penthouse 5
208 Queens Quay West
Toronto Ontario M5J 2Y5
(416) 221-3861
Business Address: 410 - 1366 Yonge Street
Toronto Ontario M4T 3A7
(416) 221-3861

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. FRANCES YU-YING TUNG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TUNG is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. FRANCES YU-YING TUNG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TUNG is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1975

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jul 1976
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1975
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Jul 1976

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Jun 1975