THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:25:22 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 1975
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 836 John Marks Avenue
Kingston Ontario K7K 0J7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6135498775
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Hotel Dieu Hospital
Department Of Radiology
166 Brock Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 5G2
Phone: (613) 544-3310
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Kingston MRI and KMI
776 Blackburn Mews East
Kingston
Kingston Ontario K7P 2N7
Phone: (613) 384-1220
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 800 John Marks Avenue
Kingston Ontario K7K 7G2
Phone: 613 384 4284
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 20 Nov 1979
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 20 1979
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Providence Care Centre Kingston
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
HOSPITAL: Providence Care Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

HOSPITAL: Kingston Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Eric Earl Sauerbrei Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Mar 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Sauerbrei (CPSO#: 28818 )
Business Address: Hotel Dieu Hospital
Department of Radiology
166 Brock Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 1S3
(613) 549-8775
Business Address: Kingston General Hospital
Department of Radiology
76 Stuart Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 2V7
(613) 548-2301
Business Address: 835 Princess Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 1G7
(613) 549-8775
Business Address: Kingston MRI and KMI
776 Blackburn Mews East
Kingston Ontario K7P 2N7
(613) 384-5488

Corporation Name: Abraham, Islam, Mussari, Soboleski Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 09 Jul 2024

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 836 John Marks Avenue
Kingston Ontario K7K 0J7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6135498775
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Hotel Dieu Hospital
Department Of Radiology
166 Brock Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 5G2
Phone: (613) 544-3310
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Kingston MRI and KMI
776 Blackburn Mews East
Kingston
Kingston Ontario K7P 2N7
Phone: (613) 384-1220
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 800 John Marks Avenue
Kingston Ontario K7K 7G2
Phone: 613 384 4284
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 20 Nov 1979
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 20 1979
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Providence Care Centre Kingston
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
HOSPITAL: Providence Care Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

HOSPITAL: Kingston Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Eric Earl Sauerbrei Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Mar 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Sauerbrei (CPSO#: 28818 )
Business Address: Hotel Dieu Hospital
Department of Radiology
166 Brock Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 1S3
(613) 549-8775
Business Address: Kingston General Hospital
Department of Radiology
76 Stuart Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 2V7
(613) 548-2301
Business Address: 835 Princess Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 1G7
(613) 549-8775
Business Address: Kingston MRI and KMI
776 Blackburn Mews East
Kingston Ontario K7P 2N7
(613) 384-5488

Corporation Name: Abraham, Islam, Mussari, Soboleski Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 09 Jul 2024

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ERIC SAUERBREI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAUERBREI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ERIC SAUERBREI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAUERBREI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 1975

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Oct 1976
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1975
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Oct 1976

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1975