THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:38:04 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1974
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Toronto General Hospital
5Ec-309
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 340-3315
Fax: (416) 340-4189

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurology
Effective: 26 Nov 1979
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neurology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 26 1979
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital Toronto
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
Sinai Health System Toronto
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: V Bril Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. V. Bril (CPSO#: 28851 )
Business Address: Toronto General Hospital
Suite 5EC309
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4
(416) 340-3315

Corporation Name: Vera Bril Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 05 May 2017

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Toronto General Hospital
5Ec-309
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 340-3315
Fax: (416) 340-4189

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurology
Effective: 26 Nov 1979
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neurology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 26 1979
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital Toronto
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
Sinai Health System Toronto
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: V Bril Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. V. Bril (CPSO#: 28851 )
Business Address: Toronto General Hospital
Suite 5EC309
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4
(416) 340-3315

Corporation Name: Vera Bril Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 05 May 2017

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. VERA BRIL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BRIL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. VERA BRIL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BRIL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1974

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Nov 1976
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1974
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Nov 1976

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Jun 1974