THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
12/05/25 02:02:42 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1972
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: LMC Endocrinology Centres
Suite 107
1929 Bayview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4G 3E8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 645-2929
Fax: (416) 645-2930

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Endocrinology and Metabolism
Effective: 05 Sep 1985
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 17 Nov 1978
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Endocrinology and Metabolism
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 05 1985
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 17 1978
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Adam Telner Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 Dec 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Telner (CPSO#: 29077 )
Business Address: LMC Endocrinology Centres
107 - 1929 Bayview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4G 3E8
(416) 645-2929

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: LMC Endocrinology Centres
Suite 107
1929 Bayview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4G 3E8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 645-2929
Fax: (416) 645-2930

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Endocrinology and Metabolism
Effective: 05 Sep 1985
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 17 Nov 1978
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Endocrinology and Metabolism
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 05 1985
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 17 1978
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Adam Telner Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 Dec 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Telner (CPSO#: 29077 )
Business Address: LMC Endocrinology Centres
107 - 1929 Bayview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4G 3E8
(416) 645-2929

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ADAM HENRY TELNER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TELNER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ADAM HENRY TELNER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TELNER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1972

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 May 1977
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1976
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 May 1977

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1976