THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:42:48 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1976
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, ITALIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 307
2130 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough Ontario M1R 3A6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 751-6141
Fax: (416) 751-5270

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 28 Nov 2011
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 28 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Oak Valley Health Markham
HOSPITAL: Oak Valley Health
LOCATION: Markham

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Corrado Morana Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 Sep 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Morana (CPSO#: 29210 )
Business Address: 28 Country Estates Drive
Markham Ontario L6C 1A4
4165436891

Corporation Name: Corrado Morana Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 17 Sep 2023

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, ITALIAN
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 307
2130 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough Ontario M1R 3A6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 751-6141
Fax: (416) 751-5270

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 28 Nov 2011
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 28 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Oak Valley Health Markham
HOSPITAL: Oak Valley Health
LOCATION: Markham

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Corrado Morana Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 Sep 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Morana (CPSO#: 29210 )
Business Address: 28 Country Estates Drive
Markham Ontario L6C 1A4
4165436891

Corporation Name: Corrado Morana Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 17 Sep 2023

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CORRADO GIOVANNI MORANA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MORANA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CORRADO GIOVANNI MORANA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MORANA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1976

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jul 2020
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 10 Jul 2019
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 1977
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 1976
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Jul 2020

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Jul 2019
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 10 Jul 2019

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Jun 1977

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Jun 1976