THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 04:18:59 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 1976
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 11958 Tecumseh Road East
Windsor Ontario N8N 1L7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5197392727
Fax: 5197399542
Address: 1775 Sprucewood Ave
Unit A11
Lasalle ON N9J 1X7
Phone: 5197392727
Fax: 5197399542
Address: 2475 McDougall AVenue
Windsor ON N8X 3N9
Phone: 5199152120
Fax: 5199154163

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Respirology
Effective: 25 Nov 1980
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Respirology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 25 1980
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Denys Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Feb 2003
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Denys (CPSO#: 29235 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 11958 Tecumseh Road East
Windsor Ontario N8N 1L7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5197392727
Fax: 5197399542
Address: 1775 Sprucewood Ave
Unit A11
Lasalle ON N9J 1X7
Phone: 5197392727
Fax: 5197399542
Address: 2475 McDougall AVenue
Windsor ON N8X 3N9
Phone: 5199152120
Fax: 5199154163

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Respirology
Effective: 25 Nov 1980
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Respirology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 25 1980
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Denys Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Feb 2003
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Denys (CPSO#: 29235 )

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Discipline Committee
14 Sep 2019
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Discipline Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Sep 14 2019
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
As from April 12, 2019, the following are imposed as terms, conditions and
limitations on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Allen Phillip Denys,
in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Denys to the College
of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT
("Undertaking")

of

DR. ALLEN PHILLIP DENYS
("Dr. Denys")

to

COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
(the "College")




A. PREAMBLE

(1) In this Undertaking:

"Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2
to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as
amended;

"Discipline Committee" means the Discipline Committee of the College;

"OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan;

"Public Register" means the College's register that is available to the
public.

(2) I, Dr. Denys, certificate of registration number 29235, am a member of
the College.

(3) I, Dr. Denys, acknowledge that, after an investigation into my practice,
including a review of patient charts by an assessor, the Inquiries,
Complaints and Reports Committee of the College referred allegations of
professional misconduct to the Discipline Committee in a Notice of
Hearing dated February 2, 2018.

(4) I, Dr. Denys, executed an Undertaking with the College on April 3, 2018
in lieu of the imposition of an Order under s. 25.4 of the Code (the "
April 3, 2018 Undertaking"). This Undertaking replaces and supersedes
the April 3, 2018 Undertaking.

B. UNDERTAKING

(5) I, Dr. Denys, undertake to abide by the provisions of this Undertaking,
effective immediately (the "Effective Date").

(6) Practice Restriction
(a) I, Dr. Denys, undertake that I will not practice sleep medicine in
any jurisdiction after the Effective Date.

(b) I, Dr. Denys, undertake that I will not apply to return to the
practice of sleep medicine in Ontario or any other jurisdiction
after the Effective Date.

(7) Monitoring

(a) I, Dr. Denys, undertake to inform the College of each and every
location where I practise or have privileges to practise,
including, but not limited to, any hospitals, clinics, offices, and
any Independent Health Facilities with which I am affiliated, in
any jurisdiction (collectively my "Practice Location" or "Practice
Locations"), within 10 (10) days of executing this Undertaking.
Going forward, I further undertake to inform the College of any and
all new Practice Locations within ten (10) days of commencing
practice at each location.

(b) I, Dr. Denys, undertake that I will submit to, and not interfere
with, unannounced inspections of my Practice Location(s) and
patient charts by a College representative for the purposes of
monitoring my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.

(c) I, Dr. Denys, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make
appropriate enquiries of OHIP and/or any person who or institution
that may have relevant information, in order for the College to
monitor my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.

(d) I, Dr. Denys, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP consent
form attached hereto as Appendix "A".

C. ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

(8) I, Dr. Denys, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred to
in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

(9) I, Dr. Denys, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely
responsible for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc.
arising from the implementation of any of the provisions of this
Undertaking.

(10) I, Dr. Denys, acknowledge that I have read and understand the provisions
of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal counsel in
reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my right to do
so.

(11) I, Dr. Denys, acknowledge that the College will provide this Undertaking
to any Chief of Staff, or a colleague with similar responsibilities, at
any Practice Location ("Chief of Staff" or "Chiefs of Staff").

(12) I, Dr. Denys, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this
Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or
incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to
the Discipline Committee.

(13) I, Dr. Denys, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms,
conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the
purposes of section 23 of the Code.

(14) Public Register

(a) I, Dr. Denys, acknowledge that, during the time period that this
Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be posted on
the Public Register.

(b) I, Dr. Denys, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking
being posted in accordance with section (14)(a) above, the
following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the
time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:

Dr. Denys was referred to the Discipline Committee on allegations
of professional misconduct. In the face of these allegations, Dr.
Denys agreed that he will not practice sleep medicine and will
never apply to return to the practice of sleep medicine in any
jurisdiction.

D. CONSENT

(15) I, Dr. Denys, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide all
Chiefs of Staff with any information the College has that led to the
circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any information
arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
As from April 12, 2019, the following are imposed as terms, conditions and
limitations on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Allen Phillip Denys,
in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Denys to the College
of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT
("Undertaking")

of

DR. ALLEN PHILLIP DENYS
("Dr. Denys")

to

COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
(the "College")




A. PREAMBLE

(1) In this Undertaking:

"Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2
to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as
amended;

"Discipline Committee" means the Discipline Committee of the College;

"OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan;

"Public Register" means the College's register that is available to the
public.

(2) I, Dr. Denys, certificate of registration number 29235, am a member of
the College.

(3) I, Dr. Denys, acknowledge that, after an investigation into my practice,
including a review of patient charts by an assessor, the Inquiries,
Complaints and Reports Committee of the College referred allegations of
professional misconduct to the Discipline Committee in a Notice of
Hearing dated February 2, 2018.

(4) I, Dr. Denys, executed an Undertaking with the College on April 3, 2018
in lieu of the imposition of an Order under s. 25.4 of the Code (the "
April 3, 2018 Undertaking"). This Undertaking replaces and supersedes
the April 3, 2018 Undertaking.

B. UNDERTAKING

(5) I, Dr. Denys, undertake to abide by the provisions of this Undertaking,
effective immediately (the "Effective Date").

(6) Practice Restriction
(a) I, Dr. Denys, undertake that I will not practice sleep medicine in
any jurisdiction after the Effective Date.

(b) I, Dr. Denys, undertake that I will not apply to return to the
practice of sleep medicine in Ontario or any other jurisdiction
after the Effective Date.

(7) Monitoring

(a) I, Dr. Denys, undertake to inform the College of each and every
location where I practise or have privileges to practise,
including, but not limited to, any hospitals, clinics, offices, and
any Independent Health Facilities with which I am affiliated, in
any jurisdiction (collectively my "Practice Location" or "Practice
Locations"), within 10 (10) days of executing this Undertaking.
Going forward, I further undertake to inform the College of any and
all new Practice Locations within ten (10) days of commencing
practice at each location.

(b) I, Dr. Denys, undertake that I will submit to, and not interfere
with, unannounced inspections of my Practice Location(s) and
patient charts by a College representative for the purposes of
monitoring my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.

(c) I, Dr. Denys, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make
appropriate enquiries of OHIP and/or any person who or institution
that may have relevant information, in order for the College to
monitor my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.

(d) I, Dr. Denys, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP consent
form attached hereto as Appendix "A".

C. ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

(8) I, Dr. Denys, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred to
in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

(9) I, Dr. Denys, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely
responsible for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc.
arising from the implementation of any of the provisions of this
Undertaking.

(10) I, Dr. Denys, acknowledge that I have read and understand the provisions
of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal counsel in
reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my right to do
so.

(11) I, Dr. Denys, acknowledge that the College will provide this Undertaking
to any Chief of Staff, or a colleague with similar responsibilities, at
any Practice Location ("Chief of Staff" or "Chiefs of Staff").

(12) I, Dr. Denys, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this
Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or
incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to
the Discipline Committee.

(13) I, Dr. Denys, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms,
conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the
purposes of section 23 of the Code.

(14) Public Register

(a) I, Dr. Denys, acknowledge that, during the time period that this
Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be posted on
the Public Register.

(b) I, Dr. Denys, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking
being posted in accordance with section (14)(a) above, the
following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the
time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:

Dr. Denys was referred to the Discipline Committee on allegations
of professional misconduct. In the face of these allegations, Dr.
Denys agreed that he will not practice sleep medicine and will
never apply to return to the practice of sleep medicine in any
jurisdiction.

D. CONSENT

(15) I, Dr. Denys, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide all
Chiefs of Staff with any information the College has that led to the
circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any information
arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings (1)

Date of Decision: 13 May 2019
Summary of Decision:
On May 13, 2019, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Allen Phillip Denys committed an act of professional misconduct in that: he failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession in his care of patients; and he engaged in acts or omissions relevant to the practice of medicine that would be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional by ordering pulmonary function testing without appropriate clinical indication in respect of which he and members of his family obtained a benefit, and by failing to comply with the Conflict of Interest Regulation by failing to submit forms to the College declaring his conflicts of interest until August 16, 2017.

FACTS

Dr. Denys is a 68-year-old respirologist practicing in Windsor, Ontario, who received his certificate of registration authorizing independent practice in 1977. At the relevant times, Dr. Denys practiced both sleep medicine and respirology.

BACKGROUND

On August 24, 2016, the College received information from a physician who had previously practiced under the supervision of Dr. Denys at the Windsor Sleep Disorders Clinic. The physician expressed concern that Dr. Denys routinely ordered pulmonary function tests without appropriate clinical indication for patients referred to the Windsor Sleep Disorders Clinic. On the basis of this information, the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee of the College (the “ICRC”) approved the appointment of investigators under section 75(1)(a) of the Health Professions Procedural Code which is Schedule 2 to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991 (the “Code”) in order to conduct a broader investigation into Dr. Denys’ practice.

INVESTIGATION INTO DR. DENYS’ PRACTICE

Facilities in which Dr. Denys and his family members have or had an interest.

At the relevant times, Dr. Denys was the Quality Advisor and an interpreting physician at a sleep medicine clinic known as the Windsor Sleep Disorders Clinic. The Windsor Sleep Disorders Clinic is an Independent Health Facility, which is permitted pursuant to a license to bill facility fees to OHIP. Dr. Denys’ daughter was the sole shareholder of the corporation that held the license to operate this Independent Health Facility.

Dr. Denys is the Quality Advisor and the main interpreting physician at a pulmonary function lab known as Essex County Respiratory Services, an Independent Health Facility. Dr. Denys’ daughter is the sole shareholder of the corporation that holds the license to operate this Independent Health Facility.

Dr. Denys is also the Quality Advisor and the main interpreting physician for pulmonary function tests at a pulmonary function and diagnostic imaging facility known as Essex County Diagnostic Services, an Independent Health Facility. One of the daughters is the sole shareholder of the corporation that holds the license to operate this Independent Health Facility.

In addition, Dr. Denys’ brother is the sole shareholder of the corporation known as Denys Sleep Supplies and Services Inc., which is operated from the same location as the Windsor Sleep Disorders Clinic and which is described as a “Patient liaison to facilitate the purchase of sleep equipment and sleep supplies for treatment of sleep apnea”.

Failure to Maintain the Standard of Practice of the Profession

The College retained Dr. Raymond Gottschalk, a respirologist who practices both sleep medicine and respirology, to opine on Dr. Denys’ care and treatment of patients at the Windsor Sleep Disorders Clinic. Dr. Gottschalk conducted a review of 50 patient charts of patients from the Windsor Sleep Disorders Clinic, along with those patients’ OHIP data, and interviewed Dr. Denys on August 17, 2017. His report was received by the College on August 30, 2017.

Dr. Gottschalk noted that in almost every chart reviewed, patients were booked for a pulmonary function test immediately upon referral to the Windsor Sleep Disorders Clinic. Dr. Gottschalk opined that there was no clinical indication for such testing evident on the face of the referral nor had the patient been evaluated in person by Dr. Denys. In addition, although routine pulmonary function tests were booked on almost all patients, Dr. Gottschalk opined that the results of such testing were not addressed in the consultation reports to the referring physicians nor were abnormalities identified or treatments recommended.

In addition, Dr. Gottschalk opined that there were other significant areas of concern with Dr. Denys’ sleep medicine practice, including that:
- There was no effective initial triage process to distinguish between severe patients and routine patients. All patients appeared to be treated with the same strategy without evaluating the severity of the condition for which they were referred;
- There was a failure to report unsafe drivers to the Ministry of Transportation or to recommend to patients that they not drive;
- The presenting complaint was not addressed in the consultation report provided by Dr. Denys to the referring physician;
- There was no effective triage following sleep studies, with the result that some patients with extremely severe sleep apnea experienced 6-9 month delays in getting treatment;
- The quality of the sleep study reports and consultation reports provided to the referring physician was poor, with nearly identical assessments and recommendations regardless of the issues or severity of concerns identified in the sleep study;

- In some cases there was no evidence that the patient had attended for a consultation with Dr. Denys following the sleep study, nor any evidence that attempts had been made to contact the patient or that the referring physician was advised that the patient did not attend for the consultation.

Dr. Gottschalk opined that Dr. Denys failed to meet the standard of practice of the profession in his care and treatment of patients in 45 of the 50 patient charts reviewed, that Dr. Denys demonstrated a lack of knowledge, skill and/or judgment in 44 of the 50 patient charts reviewed, and that Dr. Denys’ clinical practice exposed, or was likely to expose, patients to a risk of harm in 25 of the 50 patient charts reviewed.

Dr. Denys provided responses outlining the changes to his practice to address the concerns of Dr. Gottschalk. Dr. Gottschalk reviewed Dr. Denys’ responses, with reference to the specific patient charts, and delivered addendum reports dated November 24, 2017 and January 7, 2018.

Disgraceful, dishonourable and unprofessional conduct

As indicated in the reports of Dr. Gottschalk, Dr. Denys ordered pulmonary function tests without appropriate clinical indication. Dr. Denys’ daughters own the licenses of Essex County Respiratory Services and Essex County Diagnostic Services, the Independent Health Facilities where the pulmonary function tests were performed, and Dr. Denys is the main interpreting physician for pulmonary function tests at both facilities.

Referring patients for testing without appropriate clinical indication and from which he and his family members received a benefit constitutes disgraceful, dishonourable and unprofessional conduct. In addition, Dr. Denys failed to comply with conflict of interest requirements, which also constitutes disgraceful, dishonourable and unprofessional conduct.

Dr. Denys failed to inform the College of his conflicts of interest in respect of Windsor Sleep Disorders Clinic, Essex County Respiratory Services, Essex County Diagnostic Services and Denys Sleep Supplies and Services Inc. until he submitted the Conflict of Interest declaration forms on August 16, 2017.

INTERIM UNDERTAKING

On March 6, 2018, the ICRC directed that Dr. Denys enter into an Undertaking in lieu of imposing an Order pursuant to s. 25.4(1) of the Code (the “Section 25.4 Undertaking”). The Section 25.4 Undertaking provides that Dr. Denys must practice sleep medicine under the supervision of a Clinical Supervisor until the disposition of the allegations referred to the Discipline Committee.

FACTS ON PENALTY

On April 12, 2019, Dr. Denys entered into an Undertaking with the College in which he agreed to cease practicing sleep medicine in all jurisdictions and to never resume doing so.

DISPOSITION

On May 13, 2019, the Discipline Committee ordered and directed that:
- the Registrar suspend Dr. Denys’ certificate of registration for a period of four (4) months, commencing from May 14, 2019 at 12:01 a.m.
- the Registrar place the following terms, conditions and limitations on Dr. Denys’ certificate of registration:
- Dr. Denys will participate in and pass the PROBE Ethics & Boundaries Program offered by the Centre for Personalized Education for Professionals (CPEP), with a report or reports to be provided by CPEP to the College regarding Dr. Denys’ progress and compliance. Dr. Denys will complete this requirement within 6 months, or, if it is not possible to do so within 6 months, at the first available PROBE Ethics & Boundaries program for which Dr. Denys is eligible.
- Dr. Denys attend before the panel to be reprimanded.
- Dr. Denys to pay costs to the College in the amount of $6,000.00 within 30 days of the date of this Order.
Reasons for Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Hearing Date(s): May 13, 2019 9:15 a.m. start

Other Notifications (2)

Source: FSMB (USA)
Notice Type: External Findings - Other Regulatory Body
Effective Date: 20 Aug 2019
Summary:

Source: Member
Effective Date: 12 Apr 2019
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Allen Phillip Denys to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective April 12, 2019:

Dr. Denys was referred to the Discipline Committee on allegations of professional misconduct. In the face of these allegations, Dr. Denys agreed that he will not practice sleep medicine and will never apply to return to the practice of sleep medicine in any jurisdiction. 

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings (1)

Date of Decision: 13 May 2019
Summary of Decision:
On May 13, 2019, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Allen Phillip Denys committed an act of professional misconduct in that: he failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession in his care of patients; and he engaged in acts or omissions relevant to the practice of medicine that would be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional by ordering pulmonary function testing without appropriate clinical indication in respect of which he and members of his family obtained a benefit, and by failing to comply with the Conflict of Interest Regulation by failing to submit forms to the College declaring his conflicts of interest until August 16, 2017.

FACTS

Dr. Denys is a 68-year-old respirologist practicing in Windsor, Ontario, who received his certificate of registration authorizing independent practice in 1977. At the relevant times, Dr. Denys practiced both sleep medicine and respirology.

BACKGROUND

On August 24, 2016, the College received information from a physician who had previously practiced under the supervision of Dr. Denys at the Windsor Sleep Disorders Clinic. The physician expressed concern that Dr. Denys routinely ordered pulmonary function tests without appropriate clinical indication for patients referred to the Windsor Sleep Disorders Clinic. On the basis of this information, the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee of the College (the “ICRC”) approved the appointment of investigators under section 75(1)(a) of the Health Professions Procedural Code which is Schedule 2 to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991 (the “Code”) in order to conduct a broader investigation into Dr. Denys’ practice.

INVESTIGATION INTO DR. DENYS’ PRACTICE

Facilities in which Dr. Denys and his family members have or had an interest.

At the relevant times, Dr. Denys was the Quality Advisor and an interpreting physician at a sleep medicine clinic known as the Windsor Sleep Disorders Clinic. The Windsor Sleep Disorders Clinic is an Independent Health Facility, which is permitted pursuant to a license to bill facility fees to OHIP. Dr. Denys’ daughter was the sole shareholder of the corporation that held the license to operate this Independent Health Facility.

Dr. Denys is the Quality Advisor and the main interpreting physician at a pulmonary function lab known as Essex County Respiratory Services, an Independent Health Facility. Dr. Denys’ daughter is the sole shareholder of the corporation that holds the license to operate this Independent Health Facility.

Dr. Denys is also the Quality Advisor and the main interpreting physician for pulmonary function tests at a pulmonary function and diagnostic imaging facility known as Essex County Diagnostic Services, an Independent Health Facility. One of the daughters is the sole shareholder of the corporation that holds the license to operate this Independent Health Facility.

In addition, Dr. Denys’ brother is the sole shareholder of the corporation known as Denys Sleep Supplies and Services Inc., which is operated from the same location as the Windsor Sleep Disorders Clinic and which is described as a “Patient liaison to facilitate the purchase of sleep equipment and sleep supplies for treatment of sleep apnea”.

Failure to Maintain the Standard of Practice of the Profession

The College retained Dr. Raymond Gottschalk, a respirologist who practices both sleep medicine and respirology, to opine on Dr. Denys’ care and treatment of patients at the Windsor Sleep Disorders Clinic. Dr. Gottschalk conducted a review of 50 patient charts of patients from the Windsor Sleep Disorders Clinic, along with those patients’ OHIP data, and interviewed Dr. Denys on August 17, 2017. His report was received by the College on August 30, 2017.

Dr. Gottschalk noted that in almost every chart reviewed, patients were booked for a pulmonary function test immediately upon referral to the Windsor Sleep Disorders Clinic. Dr. Gottschalk opined that there was no clinical indication for such testing evident on the face of the referral nor had the patient been evaluated in person by Dr. Denys. In addition, although routine pulmonary function tests were booked on almost all patients, Dr. Gottschalk opined that the results of such testing were not addressed in the consultation reports to the referring physicians nor were abnormalities identified or treatments recommended.

In addition, Dr. Gottschalk opined that there were other significant areas of concern with Dr. Denys’ sleep medicine practice, including that:
- There was no effective initial triage process to distinguish between severe patients and routine patients. All patients appeared to be treated with the same strategy without evaluating the severity of the condition for which they were referred;
- There was a failure to report unsafe drivers to the Ministry of Transportation or to recommend to patients that they not drive;
- The presenting complaint was not addressed in the consultation report provided by Dr. Denys to the referring physician;
- There was no effective triage following sleep studies, with the result that some patients with extremely severe sleep apnea experienced 6-9 month delays in getting treatment;
- The quality of the sleep study reports and consultation reports provided to the referring physician was poor, with nearly identical assessments and recommendations regardless of the issues or severity of concerns identified in the sleep study;

- In some cases there was no evidence that the patient had attended for a consultation with Dr. Denys following the sleep study, nor any evidence that attempts had been made to contact the patient or that the referring physician was advised that the patient did not attend for the consultation.

Dr. Gottschalk opined that Dr. Denys failed to meet the standard of practice of the profession in his care and treatment of patients in 45 of the 50 patient charts reviewed, that Dr. Denys demonstrated a lack of knowledge, skill and/or judgment in 44 of the 50 patient charts reviewed, and that Dr. Denys’ clinical practice exposed, or was likely to expose, patients to a risk of harm in 25 of the 50 patient charts reviewed.

Dr. Denys provided responses outlining the changes to his practice to address the concerns of Dr. Gottschalk. Dr. Gottschalk reviewed Dr. Denys’ responses, with reference to the specific patient charts, and delivered addendum reports dated November 24, 2017 and January 7, 2018.

Disgraceful, dishonourable and unprofessional conduct

As indicated in the reports of Dr. Gottschalk, Dr. Denys ordered pulmonary function tests without appropriate clinical indication. Dr. Denys’ daughters own the licenses of Essex County Respiratory Services and Essex County Diagnostic Services, the Independent Health Facilities where the pulmonary function tests were performed, and Dr. Denys is the main interpreting physician for pulmonary function tests at both facilities.

Referring patients for testing without appropriate clinical indication and from which he and his family members received a benefit constitutes disgraceful, dishonourable and unprofessional conduct. In addition, Dr. Denys failed to comply with conflict of interest requirements, which also constitutes disgraceful, dishonourable and unprofessional conduct.

Dr. Denys failed to inform the College of his conflicts of interest in respect of Windsor Sleep Disorders Clinic, Essex County Respiratory Services, Essex County Diagnostic Services and Denys Sleep Supplies and Services Inc. until he submitted the Conflict of Interest declaration forms on August 16, 2017.

INTERIM UNDERTAKING

On March 6, 2018, the ICRC directed that Dr. Denys enter into an Undertaking in lieu of imposing an Order pursuant to s. 25.4(1) of the Code (the “Section 25.4 Undertaking”). The Section 25.4 Undertaking provides that Dr. Denys must practice sleep medicine under the supervision of a Clinical Supervisor until the disposition of the allegations referred to the Discipline Committee.

FACTS ON PENALTY

On April 12, 2019, Dr. Denys entered into an Undertaking with the College in which he agreed to cease practicing sleep medicine in all jurisdictions and to never resume doing so.

DISPOSITION

On May 13, 2019, the Discipline Committee ordered and directed that:
- the Registrar suspend Dr. Denys’ certificate of registration for a period of four (4) months, commencing from May 14, 2019 at 12:01 a.m.
- the Registrar place the following terms, conditions and limitations on Dr. Denys’ certificate of registration:
- Dr. Denys will participate in and pass the PROBE Ethics & Boundaries Program offered by the Centre for Personalized Education for Professionals (CPEP), with a report or reports to be provided by CPEP to the College regarding Dr. Denys’ progress and compliance. Dr. Denys will complete this requirement within 6 months, or, if it is not possible to do so within 6 months, at the first available PROBE Ethics & Boundaries program for which Dr. Denys is eligible.
- Dr. Denys attend before the panel to be reprimanded.
- Dr. Denys to pay costs to the College in the amount of $6,000.00 within 30 days of the date of this Order.
Reasons for Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Hearing Date(s): May 13, 2019 9:15 a.m. start

Other Notifications (2)

Source: FSMB (USA)
Notice Type: External Findings - Other Regulatory Body
Effective Date: 20 Aug 2019
Summary:

Source: Member
Effective Date: 12 Apr 2019
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Allen Phillip Denys to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective April 12, 2019:

Dr. Denys was referred to the Discipline Committee on allegations of professional misconduct. In the face of these allegations, Dr. Denys agreed that he will not practice sleep medicine and will never apply to return to the practice of sleep medicine in any jurisdiction. 

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 1976

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Suspension of registration removed. Effective: 14 Sep 2019
Terms and conditions amended by Member. Effective: 14 Sep 2019
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee Effective: 14 May 2019
Terms and conditions amended by Discipline Committee. Effective: 13 May 2019
Terms and conditions amended by Member. Effective: 12 Apr 2019
Terms and conditions amended by Member. Effective: 20 Apr 2018
Terms and conditions amended by Member. Effective: 17 Apr 2018
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 03 Apr 2018
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1977
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1976
DETAILS: Suspension of registration removed.
Date: Effective: 14 Sep 2019

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Member.
Date: Effective: 14 Sep 2019

DETAILS: Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee
Date: Effective: 14 May 2019

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Discipline Committee.
Date: Effective: 13 May 2019

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Member.
Date: Effective: 12 Apr 2019

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Member.
Date: Effective: 20 Apr 2018

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Member.
Date: Effective: 17 Apr 2018

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Apr 2018
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 03 Apr 2018

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Jun 1977

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1976