THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:55:07 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 1976
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Alexandra Medical Centre
29 Noxon Street
Ingersoll Ontario N5C 3B1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 485-9617
Fax: (519)686-8222
Address: 29 Noxon St
Alexandra Medical Centre
Ingersoll ON N5C 1B8
Phone: 519-485-9617
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1987
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1987
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Helen Frye Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Dec 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Frye (CPSO#: 29250 )
Business Address: 17 Government Road
Wawa Ontario P0S 1K0
Business Address: Alexandra Medical Centre/Hospital
29 Noxon Street
Ingersoll Ontario N5C 3V6
(519) 485-9617

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Alexandra Medical Centre
29 Noxon Street
Ingersoll Ontario N5C 3B1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 485-9617
Fax: (519)686-8222
Address: 29 Noxon St
Alexandra Medical Centre
Ingersoll ON N5C 1B8
Phone: 519-485-9617
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1987
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1987
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Helen Frye Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Dec 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Frye (CPSO#: 29250 )
Business Address: 17 Government Road
Wawa Ontario P0S 1K0
Business Address: Alexandra Medical Centre/Hospital
29 Noxon Street
Ingersoll Ontario N5C 3V6
(519) 485-9617

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Member
06 Feb 2020
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Member
EFFECTIVE DATE: Feb 06 2020
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon

As from February 6, 2020, the following is imposed as terms, conditions and
limitations on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Helen Lenore Frye in
accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Frye to the College of
Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT
("Undertaking")

of

DR. HELEN LENORE FRYE
("Dr. Frye")

to

COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
(the "College")



A. PREAMBLE

(1) In this Undertaking:

"Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2
to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as
amended;

"Discipline Committee" means the Discipline Committee of the College;

"OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan;

"Public Register" means the College's register that is available to the
public.

(2) I, Dr. Frye, certificate of registration number 29250, am a member of the
College.

(3) I, Dr. Frye, acknowledge that the College conducted an investigation
bearing File Number 1104902 (the "Investigation") into whether I engaged
in professional misconduct and/or am incompetent in my emergency medicine
practice.

B. UNDERTAKING

(4) I, Dr. Frye, undertake to abide by the provisions of this Undertaking,
effective effective upon the date this Undertaking is approved by the ICR
Committee (the "Effective Date").

(5) Practice Restrictions

(a) I, Dr. Frye, undertake that I have restricted my practice to
community-based family medicine. For greater clarity, I, Dr Frye,
will not be the most responsible physician in any hospital-based
setting.

(6) Monitoring

(a) I, Dr. Frye, undertake to inform the College of each and every
location at which I practise or have privileges, including, but not
limited to, any hospitals, clinics, offices, and any Independent
Health Facilities with which I am affiliated, in any jurisdiction
(collectively my "Practice Location" or "Practice Locations"),
within five (5) days of executing this Undertaking. Going forward,
I further undertake to inform the College of any and all new
Practice Locations within five (5) days of commencing practice at
that location.

(b) I, Dr. Frye, undertake that I will submit to, and not interfere
with, unannounced inspections of my Practice Locations and patient
charts by a College representative for the purposes of monitoring
my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.

(c) I, Dr. Frye, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make
appropriate enquiries of OHIP, and/or any person who or institution
that may have relevant information, in order for the College to
monitor my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.

(d) I, Dr. Frye, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP consent
form, attached hereto as Appendix "A".

C. ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

(7) I, Dr. Frye, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred to
in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

(8) I, Dr. Frye, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely responsible
for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc. arising from the
implementation of any of the provisions of this Undertaking.

(9) I, Dr. Frye, acknowledge that I have read and understand the provisions
of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal counsel in
reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my right to do
so.

(10) I, Dr. Frye, acknowledge that the College will provide this Undertaking
to any Chief of Staff, or a colleague with similar responsibilities, at
any Practice Location ("Chief of Staff" or "Chiefs of Staff").

(11) I, Dr. Frye, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this
Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or
incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to
the Discipline Committee.

(12) I, Dr. Frye, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms,
conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the
purposes of section 23 of the Code.



(13) Public Register

(a) I, Dr. Frye, acknowledge that, during the time period that this
Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be posted on
the Public Register.

(b) I, Dr. Frye, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking
being posted in accordance with section (12)(a) above, the
following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the
time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:

A College investigation was conducted into whether Dr. Frye
engaged in professional misconduct and/or was incompetent in
the practice of emergency medicine. As a result of the
investigation, Dr. Frye has limited her practice to
community-based family medicine. Dr. Frye will not be the
most-responsible physician in any hospital-based setting.

D. CONSENT

(14) I, Dr. Frye, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide all
Chiefs of Staff with any information the College has that led to the
circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any information
arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon

As from February 6, 2020, the following is imposed as terms, conditions and
limitations on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Helen Lenore Frye in
accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Frye to the College of
Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT
("Undertaking")

of

DR. HELEN LENORE FRYE
("Dr. Frye")

to

COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
(the "College")



A. PREAMBLE

(1) In this Undertaking:

"Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2
to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as
amended;

"Discipline Committee" means the Discipline Committee of the College;

"OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan;

"Public Register" means the College's register that is available to the
public.

(2) I, Dr. Frye, certificate of registration number 29250, am a member of the
College.

(3) I, Dr. Frye, acknowledge that the College conducted an investigation
bearing File Number 1104902 (the "Investigation") into whether I engaged
in professional misconduct and/or am incompetent in my emergency medicine
practice.

B. UNDERTAKING

(4) I, Dr. Frye, undertake to abide by the provisions of this Undertaking,
effective effective upon the date this Undertaking is approved by the ICR
Committee (the "Effective Date").

(5) Practice Restrictions

(a) I, Dr. Frye, undertake that I have restricted my practice to
community-based family medicine. For greater clarity, I, Dr Frye,
will not be the most responsible physician in any hospital-based
setting.

(6) Monitoring

(a) I, Dr. Frye, undertake to inform the College of each and every
location at which I practise or have privileges, including, but not
limited to, any hospitals, clinics, offices, and any Independent
Health Facilities with which I am affiliated, in any jurisdiction
(collectively my "Practice Location" or "Practice Locations"),
within five (5) days of executing this Undertaking. Going forward,
I further undertake to inform the College of any and all new
Practice Locations within five (5) days of commencing practice at
that location.

(b) I, Dr. Frye, undertake that I will submit to, and not interfere
with, unannounced inspections of my Practice Locations and patient
charts by a College representative for the purposes of monitoring
my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.

(c) I, Dr. Frye, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make
appropriate enquiries of OHIP, and/or any person who or institution
that may have relevant information, in order for the College to
monitor my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.

(d) I, Dr. Frye, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP consent
form, attached hereto as Appendix "A".

C. ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

(7) I, Dr. Frye, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred to
in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

(8) I, Dr. Frye, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely responsible
for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc. arising from the
implementation of any of the provisions of this Undertaking.

(9) I, Dr. Frye, acknowledge that I have read and understand the provisions
of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal counsel in
reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my right to do
so.

(10) I, Dr. Frye, acknowledge that the College will provide this Undertaking
to any Chief of Staff, or a colleague with similar responsibilities, at
any Practice Location ("Chief of Staff" or "Chiefs of Staff").

(11) I, Dr. Frye, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this
Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or
incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to
the Discipline Committee.

(12) I, Dr. Frye, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms,
conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the
purposes of section 23 of the Code.



(13) Public Register

(a) I, Dr. Frye, acknowledge that, during the time period that this
Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be posted on
the Public Register.

(b) I, Dr. Frye, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking
being posted in accordance with section (12)(a) above, the
following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the
time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:

A College investigation was conducted into whether Dr. Frye
engaged in professional misconduct and/or was incompetent in
the practice of emergency medicine. As a result of the
investigation, Dr. Frye has limited her practice to
community-based family medicine. Dr. Frye will not be the
most-responsible physician in any hospital-based setting.

D. CONSENT

(14) I, Dr. Frye, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide all
Chiefs of Staff with any information the College has that led to the
circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any information
arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (2)

Source: Member
Effective Date: 06 Feb 2020
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Helen Lenore Frye to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective February 6, 2020:

A College investigation was conducted into whether Dr. Frye engaged in professional misconduct and/or was incompetent in the practice of emergency medicine. As a result of the investigation, Dr. Frye has limited her practice to community-based family medicine. Dr. Frye will not be the most-responsible physician in any hospital-based setting. 


Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 16 Mar 2018
Summary:
Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College By-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a SCERP:

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (2)

Source: Member
Effective Date: 06 Feb 2020
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Helen Lenore Frye to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective February 6, 2020:

A College investigation was conducted into whether Dr. Frye engaged in professional misconduct and/or was incompetent in the practice of emergency medicine. As a result of the investigation, Dr. Frye has limited her practice to community-based family medicine. Dr. Frye will not be the most-responsible physician in any hospital-based setting. 


Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 16 Mar 2018
Summary:
Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College By-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a SCERP:

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 1976

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 06 Feb 2020
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 May 1986
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 07 Sep 1977
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 1977
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1976
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Feb 2020
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 06 Feb 2020

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 May 1986

DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 07 Sep 1977

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Jun 1977

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Jun 1976