THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
23/05/25 05:01:01 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1976
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2867 Ellesmere Road
Toronto
Ontario
M1E 4B9
Toronto Ontario M1E 4B9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 281-7270
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 01 Nov 1983
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1982
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 01 1983
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1982
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Nunavut

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. E. Fonberg Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Fonberg (CPSO#: 29392 )
Business Address: 2867 Ellesmere Road
Toronto Ontario M1E 4B9
(416) 281-7404

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2867 Ellesmere Road
Toronto
Ontario
M1E 4B9
Toronto Ontario M1E 4B9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 281-7270
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 01 Nov 1983
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1982
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 01 1983
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1982
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Nunavut

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. E. Fonberg Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Fonberg (CPSO#: 29392 )
Business Address: 2867 Ellesmere Road
Toronto Ontario M1E 4B9
(416) 281-7404

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ERIC MICHAEL FONBERG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FONBERG is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ERIC MICHAEL FONBERG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FONBERG is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1976

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jul 1977
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 14 Jun 1977
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1976
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Jul 1977

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 14 Jun 1977

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1976