THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:50:17 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1976
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Penthouse 3
110 Copper Creek Drive
Markham Ontario L6B 0P9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 472-9400
Fax: (905) 472-9409

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1978
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1978
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Oak Valley Health Markham
HOSPITAL: Oak Valley Health
LOCATION: Markham

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ronald Oda Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Mar 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Oda (CPSO#: 29461 )
Business Address: Penthouse 3
110 Copper Creek Drive
Markham Ontario L6B 0P9
(905) 472-9400

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Penthouse 3
110 Copper Creek Drive
Markham Ontario L6B 0P9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 472-9400
Fax: (905) 472-9409

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1978
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1978
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Oak Valley Health Markham
HOSPITAL: Oak Valley Health
LOCATION: Markham

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ronald Oda Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Mar 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Oda (CPSO#: 29461 )
Business Address: Penthouse 3
110 Copper Creek Drive
Markham Ontario L6B 0P9
(905) 472-9400

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RONALD GEORGE ODA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ODA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RONALD GEORGE ODA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ODA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1976

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jul 1977
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1976
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Jul 1977

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Jun 1976