THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:11:17 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1976
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, YIDDISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2888 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON M6B 4H6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: 437-317-9832
Address: Medical Diagnostics and Consulting
1 - 820 Red River Road
Thunder Bay ON P7B 1K2
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Universal Sleep Disorders Clinic
2888 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON M6B 4H6
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Respirology
Effective: 21 May 2015
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
Internal Medicine
Effective: 09 Jun 1980
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Respirology
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 21 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 09 1980
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Medical record requests for 4800 Leslie office may be addressed to: [email protected]
Date Received: 21 Jan 2021

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North York General Hospital Toronto
Sinai Health System Toronto
HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: A. Born Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Aug 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Born (CPSO#: 29560 )
Business Address: 2888 Bathurst St
North York ON M6B 4H6
4164517422
Business Address: 302 - 4800 Leslie Street
Toronto Ontario M2J 2K9
(416) 225-9299

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, YIDDISH
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2888 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON M6B 4H6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: 437-317-9832
Address: Medical Diagnostics and Consulting
1 - 820 Red River Road
Thunder Bay ON P7B 1K2
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Universal Sleep Disorders Clinic
2888 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON M6B 4H6
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Respirology
Effective: 21 May 2015
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
Internal Medicine
Effective: 09 Jun 1980
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Respirology
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 21 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 09 1980
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Medical record requests for 4800 Leslie office may be addressed to: [email protected]
Date Received: 21 Jan 2021

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North York General Hospital Toronto
Sinai Health System Toronto
HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: A. Born Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Aug 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Born (CPSO#: 29560 )
Business Address: 2888 Bathurst St
North York ON M6B 4H6
4164517422
Business Address: 302 - 4800 Leslie Street
Toronto Ontario M2J 2K9
(416) 225-9299

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ABRAHAM BORN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BORN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ABRAHAM BORN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BORN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1976

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Aug 1977
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1976
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Aug 1977

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Jun 1976