THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 04:40:56 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 1976
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3215 Old Barry's Bay Rd.
Barry's Bay ON K0J 1B0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1978
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1978
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: C.R.S. Dawes Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Dec 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Dawes (CPSO#: 29681 )
Business Address: 21 St. Francis Memorial Drive
Barry's Bay Ontario K0J 1B0
(613) 756-2320
Business Address: Rr 2
3215 old barry's bay road
Barry's Bay ON K0J 1B0
6136121937
Business Address: 3215 Old Barry's Bay Rd
Barrys Bay ON K0J 1B0
6136121937

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3215 Old Barry's Bay Rd.
Barry's Bay ON K0J 1B0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1978
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1978
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: C.R.S. Dawes Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Dec 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Dawes (CPSO#: 29681 )
Business Address: 21 St. Francis Memorial Drive
Barry's Bay Ontario K0J 1B0
(613) 756-2320
Business Address: Rr 2
3215 old barry's bay road
Barry's Bay ON K0J 1B0
6136121937
Business Address: 3215 Old Barry's Bay Rd
Barrys Bay ON K0J 1B0
6136121937

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHARLES RAYMOND SPURGEON DAWES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DAWES is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHARLES RAYMOND SPURGEON DAWES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DAWES is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 1976

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Oct 1977
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 1976
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Oct 1977

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Jul 1976