THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 05:04:14 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1976
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CZECH, HUNGARIAN, SLOVAK

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 200-1920 Yonge St
Toronto ON M4S 3E2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-482=5558
Fax: 833-482-8999
Address: 3500-2 Bloor St E
Toronto ON M4W 1A8
Phone: 6474265127
Fax: 6474388300
Address: 399 Bathurst St
7 MP 407
Tourette Clinic
Toronto ON M5T 2S8
Phone: 4166035794
Fax: 4166035182

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 01 Jan 1982
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 01 1982
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: P. Sandor Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Nov 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Sandor (CPSO#: 29688 )
Business Address: 305-55 Eglinton Ave E
Toronto ON M4P 1G8
Business Address: TS Neurodevelopmental Clinic
Toronto Western Hospital
3 West Wing, Room 400
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto Ontario M5T 2S8
(416) 603-5794
Business Address: 229 Yonge Street
Toronto Ontario M5B 1N9
(416) 363-3751
Business Address: 3500-2 Bloor St E
Toronto ON M4W 1A8
6474265127

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CZECH, HUNGARIAN, SLOVAK
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 200-1920 Yonge St
Toronto ON M4S 3E2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-482=5558
Fax: 833-482-8999
Address: 3500-2 Bloor St E
Toronto ON M4W 1A8
Phone: 6474265127
Fax: 6474388300
Address: 399 Bathurst St
7 MP 407
Tourette Clinic
Toronto ON M5T 2S8
Phone: 4166035794
Fax: 4166035182

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 01 Jan 1982
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 01 1982
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: P. Sandor Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Nov 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Sandor (CPSO#: 29688 )
Business Address: 305-55 Eglinton Ave E
Toronto ON M4P 1G8
Business Address: TS Neurodevelopmental Clinic
Toronto Western Hospital
3 West Wing, Room 400
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto Ontario M5T 2S8
(416) 603-5794
Business Address: 229 Yonge Street
Toronto Ontario M5B 1N9
(416) 363-3751
Business Address: 3500-2 Bloor St E
Toronto ON M4W 1A8
6474265127

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PAVEL SANDOR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SANDOR is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PAVEL SANDOR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SANDOR is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1976

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Oct 1977
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 17 Jun 1977
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1976
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 31 Oct 1977

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 17 Jun 1977

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Jun 1976