THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:15:50 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Liverpool School of Medicine, 1975
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Toronto Western Hospital
1E47 New East Wing
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto Ontario M5T 2S8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 603-5862
Fax: (416) 603-4376

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Orthopedic Surgery
Effective: 13 Nov 1980
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Orthopedic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 13 1980
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Alberta

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Darrell Ogilvie-Harris Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Jan 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Ogilvie-Harris (CPSO#: 29711 )
Business Address: Toronto Western Hospital
1E47 - 399 Bathurst Street
New East Wing
Toronto Ontario M5T 2S8
(416) 603-5862

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Liverpool School of Medicine, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Toronto Western Hospital
1E47 New East Wing
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto Ontario M5T 2S8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 603-5862
Fax: (416) 603-4376

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Orthopedic Surgery
Effective: 13 Nov 1980
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Orthopedic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 13 1980
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Alberta

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Darrell Ogilvie-Harris Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Jan 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Ogilvie-Harris (CPSO#: 29711 )
Business Address: Toronto Western Hospital
1E47 - 399 Bathurst Street
New East Wing
Toronto Ontario M5T 2S8
(416) 603-5862

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DARRELL JUSTICE OGILVIE-HARRIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OGILVIE-HARRIS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DARRELL JUSTICE OGILVIE-HARRIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OGILVIE-HARRIS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Liverpool School of Medicine, 1975

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Nov 1977
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Aug 1976
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Nov 1977

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Aug 1976