THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:34:19 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Li Ka Shing Faculty of Medicine, University of Hong Kong, 1971
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CANTONESE, CHINESE, MANDARIN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 408A-4040 Finch Ave E
Scarborough ON M1S 4V5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4162974807
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Across Boundaries Mental
Health Centre
51 Clarkson Avenue
Toronto Ontario M6E 4Z8
Phone: (416) 787-3007
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Hong Fook Mental Health
Association
130 Dundas St W
Toronto Ontario M5T 2E4
Phone: (416) 493-4242
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 16 Nov 1977
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 16 1977
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Hong Kong S A R

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Hung Tat Lo Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Oct 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Lo (CPSO#: 29724 )
Business Address: 409 - 4040 Finch Avenue East
Scarborough Ontario M1S 4V5
(416) 297-4807
Business Address: 408A-4040 Finch Ave E
Scarborough ON M1S 4V5
4162974807

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CANTONESE, CHINESE, MANDARIN
Medical School: Li Ka Shing Faculty of Medicine, University of Hong Kong, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 408A-4040 Finch Ave E
Scarborough ON M1S 4V5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4162974807
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Across Boundaries Mental
Health Centre
51 Clarkson Avenue
Toronto Ontario M6E 4Z8
Phone: (416) 787-3007
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Hong Fook Mental Health
Association
130 Dundas St W
Toronto Ontario M5T 2E4
Phone: (416) 493-4242
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 16 Nov 1977
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 16 1977
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Hong Kong S A R

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Hung Tat Lo Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Oct 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Lo (CPSO#: 29724 )
Business Address: 409 - 4040 Finch Avenue East
Scarborough Ontario M1S 4V5
(416) 297-4807
Business Address: 408A-4040 Finch Ave E
Scarborough ON M1S 4V5
4162974807

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HUNG-TAT LO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LO is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HUNG-TAT LO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LO is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings (1)

Date of Decision: 13 Jan 2012
Summary of Decision:
On January 13, 2012, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Hung-Tat Lo committed an act of professional misconduct, in that he failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession.

Record-keeping

Dr. Lo failed to maintain the standard of practice in record-keeping with respect to Patient A. The patient's record was largely illegible and most entries contained scant information. Changes to medications were made at the last three appointments without documented communication with Patient A's family doctor, who was managing the patient's medications on a more consistent basis. Risk assessments and their conclusions were not documented.

Dr. Lo also failed to maintain the standard of practice in record-keeping with respect to fourteen of fifteen patients. Patient records were largely illegible and transcriptions were required for review. The patient encounter entries were generally scant. Most charts did not have the initial history, diagnosis and treatment plan charted in any detail. There was a general lack of pertinent negative findings, and mental status exams and risk assessments were not documented.

Care and Treatment

Dr. Lo failed to maintain the standard of practice in his care and treatment of Patient A with respect to his collateral fact gathering and follow-up. Dr. Lo also failed to maintain the standard of practice in his care and treatment of two patients, in that he: 1) failed to adequately monitor the Lithium level of one patient and failed to make the necessary inquires that would have led to the disclosure of the patient's thyroid carcinoma; and 2) managed an alcoholic patient with out-dated treatment and inappropriate use of antabuse.

On February 7, 2013, the Committee ordered and directed that Dr. Lo shall:

1. undergo, at his own expense, a re-assessment of his practice within 12 months which shall include a review of his documentation and record-keeping, his appropriate prescription and monitoring of Lithium in clinical practice, his communications with family members and family physicians, and his identification and referral to specialists of patients in his care with comorbid alcoholism;
2. abide by all recommendations provided by the Assessor;
3. attend for a reprimand on a date to be fixed within 3 months; and
4. pay costs of $3,650 to the College within 30 days
 
Reasons for Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Fe1-5,9-11,Ap22,23,Jn14-17,Se27-30,2010,Fe7-8,2011

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings (1)

Date of Decision: 13 Jan 2012
Summary of Decision:
On January 13, 2012, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Hung-Tat Lo committed an act of professional misconduct, in that he failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession.

Record-keeping

Dr. Lo failed to maintain the standard of practice in record-keeping with respect to Patient A. The patient's record was largely illegible and most entries contained scant information. Changes to medications were made at the last three appointments without documented communication with Patient A's family doctor, who was managing the patient's medications on a more consistent basis. Risk assessments and their conclusions were not documented.

Dr. Lo also failed to maintain the standard of practice in record-keeping with respect to fourteen of fifteen patients. Patient records were largely illegible and transcriptions were required for review. The patient encounter entries were generally scant. Most charts did not have the initial history, diagnosis and treatment plan charted in any detail. There was a general lack of pertinent negative findings, and mental status exams and risk assessments were not documented.

Care and Treatment

Dr. Lo failed to maintain the standard of practice in his care and treatment of Patient A with respect to his collateral fact gathering and follow-up. Dr. Lo also failed to maintain the standard of practice in his care and treatment of two patients, in that he: 1) failed to adequately monitor the Lithium level of one patient and failed to make the necessary inquires that would have led to the disclosure of the patient's thyroid carcinoma; and 2) managed an alcoholic patient with out-dated treatment and inappropriate use of antabuse.

On February 7, 2013, the Committee ordered and directed that Dr. Lo shall:

1. undergo, at his own expense, a re-assessment of his practice within 12 months which shall include a review of his documentation and record-keeping, his appropriate prescription and monitoring of Lithium in clinical practice, his communications with family members and family physicians, and his identification and referral to specialists of patients in his care with comorbid alcoholism;
2. abide by all recommendations provided by the Assessor;
3. attend for a reprimand on a date to be fixed within 3 months; and
4. pay costs of $3,650 to the College within 30 days
 
Reasons for Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Fe1-5,9-11,Ap22,23,Jn14-17,Se27-30,2010,Fe7-8,2011

Training

Medical School: Li Ka Shing Faculty of Medicine, University of Hong Kong, 1971

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Oct 2018
Terms and conditions amended by Member. Effective: 03 Jun 2016
Terms and conditions amended by Discipline Committee. Effective: 07 Feb 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 19 Mar 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Dec 1977
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1975
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Oct 2018

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Member.
Date: Effective: 03 Jun 2016

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Discipline Committee.
Date: Effective: 07 Feb 2013

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Mar 2008
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 19 Mar 2008

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Dec 1977

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1975