THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 04:22:19 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: National University of Colombia, 1972
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, SPANISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 356 Woodroffe Ave
Ottawa ON K2A 3V6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-656-7443
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 07 Dec 1982
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 24 Nov 1982
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 07 1982
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 24 1982
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: JUAN R. SALCEDO MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Nov 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Salcedo (CPSO#: 29822 )
Business Address: 2948 Baseline Rd
Nepean ON K2H 8T5

Corporation Name: Juan R. Salcedo Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 21 Jan 2023

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, SPANISH
Medical School: National University of Colombia, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 356 Woodroffe Ave
Ottawa ON K2A 3V6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-656-7443
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 07 Dec 1982
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 24 Nov 1982
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 07 1982
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 24 1982
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: JUAN R. SALCEDO MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Nov 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Salcedo (CPSO#: 29822 )
Business Address: 2948 Baseline Rd
Nepean ON K2H 8T5

Corporation Name: Juan R. Salcedo Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 21 Jan 2023

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JUAN ROBERTO SALCEDO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SALCEDO is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JUAN ROBERTO SALCEDO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SALCEDO is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: National University of Colombia, 1972

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Mar 1978
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Mar 1978