THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 05:05:25 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1974
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 13 Nov 1978
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 13 1978
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Grey Bruce Health Services Owen Sound Owen Sound
HOSPITAL: Grey Bruce Health Services Owen Sound
LOCATION: Owen Sound

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. David D. Bell Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Jun 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Bell (CPSO#: 29994 )
Business Address: Grey Bruce Regional Hospital
1800 8th Street East
Owen Sound Ontario N4K 6M9
(519) 376-2121

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 13 Nov 1978
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 13 1978
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Grey Bruce Health Services Owen Sound Owen Sound
HOSPITAL: Grey Bruce Health Services Owen Sound
LOCATION: Owen Sound

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. David D. Bell Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Jun 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Bell (CPSO#: 29994 )
Business Address: Grey Bruce Regional Hospital
1800 8th Street East
Owen Sound Ontario N4K 6M9
(519) 376-2121

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Member
20 Dec 2022
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Member
EFFECTIVE DATE: Dec 20 2022
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
As from December 20, 2022, the following are imposed as terms, conditions and limitations on the certificate of registration held by Dr. David Daniel Bell in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Bell to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT
(“Undertaking”)

of

DR. DAVID DANIEL BELL
(“Dr. Bell”)

to

COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
(the “College”)
________________________________________________________________________

A. PREAMBLE

(1) In this Undertaking:

“Code” means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2 to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as amended;

“CPD” means continuing professional development;

“OHIP” means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan;

“Public Register” means the College’s register that is available to the public.

(2) I, Dr. Bell, certificate of registration number 29994, am a member of the College. I acknowledge that the College has inquired into my compliance with the requirement to participate in a program of CPD.

(3) I, Dr. Bell, have ceased to practice medicine due to retirement and I am entering into this Undertaking as an alternative to complying with the CPD requirement under section 29 of Ontario Regulation 114/94 (made under the Medicine Act, 1991).

(4) I, Dr. Bell, am currently not practising medicine in Ontario and I am entering into this Undertaking as an alternative to complying with the CPD requirement under section 29 of Ontario Regulation 114/94 (made under the Medicine Act, 1991).

B. UNDERTAKING

(5) I, Dr. Bell, undertake to abide by the provisions of this Undertaking, effective immediately.

(6) I, Dr. Bell, acknowledge that, other than in Ontario, I am not currently registered to practise medicine in any other jurisdiction, and I further acknowledge that I currently do not have any outstanding applications for registration to practice medicine in any jurisdiction.

(7) I, Dr. Bell, undertake that, effective immediately, I will not practise medicine in any jurisdiction until each and every one of the following conditions have been met:

(a) I provide a minimum of forty-five (45) days’ notice to the College of my intent to return to the practice of medicine;

(b) I provide the College with proof that I am participating in a program of CPD that meets the requirements for CPD of the Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada, the College of Family Physicians of Canada, or an organization that has been approved by the College for that purpose that meets the requirements for CPD set by the Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada or the College of Family Physicians of Canada; and

(c) The College approves my return to the practice of medicine.

(8) I, Dr. Bell, undertake that upon signing this Undertaking I shall forward a request to the General Manager of OHIP that my billing number be deactivated for services rendered after the date I cease to practise and before the date the College agrees that I may return to practise in accordance with the provisions of this Undertaking.

(9) I, Dr. Bell, undertake to abide by the College’s Policy on Closing a Medical Practice.

C. ACKNOWLEDGEMENTS

(10) I, Dr. Bell, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred to in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

(11) I, Dr. Bell, acknowledge that in considering my request to return to practice, the College may, among other things:

(a) request that I agree to specified terms, limitations or conditions being placed upon my certificate of registration; and

(b) request that I enter into an appropriate assessment and/or monitoring agreement with the College.

(12) I, Dr. Bell, acknowledge that I shall be solely responsible for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc. arising from the implementation of any of the provisions of this Undertaking.

(13) I, Dr. Bell, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to the Discipline Committee of the College.

(14) I, Dr. Bell, acknowledge that I have read and understand the provisions of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal counsel in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my right to do so.

(15) I, Dr. Bell, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms, conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the purposes of section 23 of the Code.

(16) Public Register

(a) I, Dr. Bell, acknowledge that, during the time period that this Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be posted on the Public Register.

D. CONSENT

(17) I, Dr. Bell, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make appropriate enquiries of OHIP and any person who or institution that may have relevant information, in order for the College to monitor my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.

(18) I, Dr. Bell, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP consent form, attached hereto as Appendix “A” and that the consent forms part of this Undertaking.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
As from December 20, 2022, the following are imposed as terms, conditions and limitations on the certificate of registration held by Dr. David Daniel Bell in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Bell to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT
(“Undertaking”)

of

DR. DAVID DANIEL BELL
(“Dr. Bell”)

to

COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
(the “College”)
________________________________________________________________________

A. PREAMBLE

(1) In this Undertaking:

“Code” means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2 to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as amended;

“CPD” means continuing professional development;

“OHIP” means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan;

“Public Register” means the College’s register that is available to the public.

(2) I, Dr. Bell, certificate of registration number 29994, am a member of the College. I acknowledge that the College has inquired into my compliance with the requirement to participate in a program of CPD.

(3) I, Dr. Bell, have ceased to practice medicine due to retirement and I am entering into this Undertaking as an alternative to complying with the CPD requirement under section 29 of Ontario Regulation 114/94 (made under the Medicine Act, 1991).

(4) I, Dr. Bell, am currently not practising medicine in Ontario and I am entering into this Undertaking as an alternative to complying with the CPD requirement under section 29 of Ontario Regulation 114/94 (made under the Medicine Act, 1991).

B. UNDERTAKING

(5) I, Dr. Bell, undertake to abide by the provisions of this Undertaking, effective immediately.

(6) I, Dr. Bell, acknowledge that, other than in Ontario, I am not currently registered to practise medicine in any other jurisdiction, and I further acknowledge that I currently do not have any outstanding applications for registration to practice medicine in any jurisdiction.

(7) I, Dr. Bell, undertake that, effective immediately, I will not practise medicine in any jurisdiction until each and every one of the following conditions have been met:

(a) I provide a minimum of forty-five (45) days’ notice to the College of my intent to return to the practice of medicine;

(b) I provide the College with proof that I am participating in a program of CPD that meets the requirements for CPD of the Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada, the College of Family Physicians of Canada, or an organization that has been approved by the College for that purpose that meets the requirements for CPD set by the Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada or the College of Family Physicians of Canada; and

(c) The College approves my return to the practice of medicine.

(8) I, Dr. Bell, undertake that upon signing this Undertaking I shall forward a request to the General Manager of OHIP that my billing number be deactivated for services rendered after the date I cease to practise and before the date the College agrees that I may return to practise in accordance with the provisions of this Undertaking.

(9) I, Dr. Bell, undertake to abide by the College’s Policy on Closing a Medical Practice.

C. ACKNOWLEDGEMENTS

(10) I, Dr. Bell, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred to in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

(11) I, Dr. Bell, acknowledge that in considering my request to return to practice, the College may, among other things:

(a) request that I agree to specified terms, limitations or conditions being placed upon my certificate of registration; and

(b) request that I enter into an appropriate assessment and/or monitoring agreement with the College.

(12) I, Dr. Bell, acknowledge that I shall be solely responsible for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc. arising from the implementation of any of the provisions of this Undertaking.

(13) I, Dr. Bell, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to the Discipline Committee of the College.

(14) I, Dr. Bell, acknowledge that I have read and understand the provisions of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal counsel in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my right to do so.

(15) I, Dr. Bell, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms, conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the purposes of section 23 of the Code.

(16) Public Register

(a) I, Dr. Bell, acknowledge that, during the time period that this Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be posted on the Public Register.

D. CONSENT

(17) I, Dr. Bell, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make appropriate enquiries of OHIP and any person who or institution that may have relevant information, in order for the College to monitor my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.

(18) I, Dr. Bell, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP consent form, attached hereto as Appendix “A” and that the consent forms part of this Undertaking.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1974

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 20 Dec 2022
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 1978
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Dec 2022
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 20 Dec 2022

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Jun 1978