THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:27:06 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1977
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3405 Rhodes Drive
Windsor Ontario N8W 5B3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 974-8879
Fax: (519) 974-9261

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Urology
Effective: 24 Nov 1982
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Urology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 24 1982
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Chatham-Kent Health Alliance Chatham
HOSPITAL: Chatham-Kent Health Alliance
LOCATION: Chatham
Hospital Notices
Source: Hospital
Effective Date: 29 Nov 2021
Summary:
On November 29, 2021, Windsor Regional Hospital notified the College, pursuant to section 33(b) of the Public Hospitals Act and section 85.5(1) of the Health Professions Procedural Code, that Windsor Regional Hospital suspended Dr. Sorensen’s hospital privileges effective November 26, 2021 due to failure to comply with WRH’s Chart Completion Policy and Professional Staff Bylaw.
 
On May 19, 2022, Windsor Regional Hospital provided an update to the College that the suspension of Dr. Sorensen’s hospital privileges remains in effect pending a hearing before the hospital Board.
 
On February 24, 2023, Windsor Regional Hospital provided a further update to the College, advising that the hospital Board has ordered that Dr. Sorensen’s privileges be revoked and his request for reappointment is denied but the suspension of his hospital privileges continues pending Dr. Sorensen exhausting his rights under the Public Hospitals Act, including Dr. Sorensen’s appeal to the Health Professions Appeal and Review Board.
 
 

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: R. B. Sorensen Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 26 Mar 2025

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3405 Rhodes Drive
Windsor Ontario N8W 5B3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 974-8879
Fax: (519) 974-9261

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Urology
Effective: 24 Nov 1982
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Urology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 24 1982
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Chatham-Kent Health Alliance Chatham
HOSPITAL: Chatham-Kent Health Alliance
LOCATION: Chatham
Hospital Notices
Source: Hospital
Effective Date: 29 Nov 2021
Summary:
On November 29, 2021, Windsor Regional Hospital notified the College, pursuant to section 33(b) of the Public Hospitals Act and section 85.5(1) of the Health Professions Procedural Code, that Windsor Regional Hospital suspended Dr. Sorensen’s hospital privileges effective November 26, 2021 due to failure to comply with WRH’s Chart Completion Policy and Professional Staff Bylaw.
 
On May 19, 2022, Windsor Regional Hospital provided an update to the College that the suspension of Dr. Sorensen’s hospital privileges remains in effect pending a hearing before the hospital Board.
 
On February 24, 2023, Windsor Regional Hospital provided a further update to the College, advising that the hospital Board has ordered that Dr. Sorensen’s privileges be revoked and his request for reappointment is denied but the suspension of his hospital privileges continues pending Dr. Sorensen exhausting his rights under the Public Hospitals Act, including Dr. Sorensen’s appeal to the Health Professions Appeal and Review Board.
 
 

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: R. B. Sorensen Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 26 Mar 2025

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Member
17 Dec 2021
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Member
EFFECTIVE DATE: Dec 17 2021
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Effective December 17, 2021, Dr. Sorensen must cease performing Laser TURP procedures until such time he obtains a College approved Clinical Supervisor

As from November 11, 2021, the following are imposed as terms, conditions and limitations on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Ronald Bjorndahl Sorensen in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Sorensen to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT
(“Undertaking”)

of

DR. RONALD BJORNDAHL SORENSEN
(“Dr. Sorensen”)

to

COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
(the “College”)

A. PREAMBLE

(1) In this Undertaking:

“Code” means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2 to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as amended;

“OHIP” means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan;

“Public Register” means the College’s register that is available to the public.

(2) I, Dr. Sorensen, certificate of registration number 30034, am a member of the College.

(3) I, Dr. Sorensen, acknowledge that following an investigation that raised concerns about my standard of practice in urology, I underwent remediation and submitted to a reassessment of my practice further to an undertaking that I signed on October 24, 2018 (the “October 24, 2018 Undertaking”). I did not complete an aspect of the remediation and was therefore unable to be assessed in that area.

B. UNDERTAKING

(4) I, Dr. Sorensen, undertake to abide by the provisions of this Undertaking, effective immediately.

(5) I, Dr. Sorensen, undertake that during the period of Clinical Supervision set out below, I will only perform Laser Transurethral Resection of the Prostate procedures (Laser TURP Procedures) that have been pre-operatively reviewed and approved by the Clinical Supervisor.

(6) I, Dr. Sorensen, undertake to keep a Log of all Laser TURP Procedures I propose to perform (the “Laser TURP Procedures Log”), in the form attached as set out in Appendix “A”, which will include at least the following information:

(a) the date of the appointment;

(b) the name of the patient and chart/file number;

(c) the clinical indication;

(d) my signature;

(e) the date of the Clinical Supervisor’s review; and

(f) the Clinical Supervisor’s signature.

(7) Clinical Supervision

(a) I, Dr. Sorensen, undertake to practise under the guidance of a clinical supervisor or clinical supervisors acceptable to the College (the “Clinical Supervisor” or “Clinical Supervisors”) on the terms set out below (“Clinical Supervision”). Clinical Supervision shall not end until a minimum of three (3) Laser TURP Procedures have been directly observed by the Clinical Supervisor, as set out in further detail below.

(b) I, Dr. Sorensen, acknowledge that I have reviewed the Clinical Supervisor’s undertaking, attached hereto as Appendix “B”, and understand what is required of the Clinical Supervisor. The Clinical Supervisor will, at minimum:

(i) Review the materials provided by the College and have an orientation session with me, including to discuss the objectives for the Clinical Supervision;

(ii) Pre-operatively review with me any cases in which I propose to perform Laser TURP Procedures. If the Laser TURP Procedure is warranted, the Clinical Supervisor will provide approval to me to proceed with the procedure.

(iii) Sign and date the Laser TURP Procedure Log and each patient chart to confirm that the Clinical Supervisor has reviewed the proposed Laser TURP Procedure and document whether the procedure has been approved;

(iv) Meet with me at my Practice Location, or another location approved by the College, to directly observe me performing a minimum of three (3) Laser TURP Procedures. The Clinical Supervisor’s observation of my performance of these Laser TURP Procedures may be spread out over one (1) or more meetings with me.

(v) Review each patient chart pertaining to the observed Laser TURP Procedures;

(vi) Discuss any concerns arising from the observation and chart reviews;

(vii) Make recommendations to me for practice improvements and ongoing professional development and inquire into my compliance with the recommendations;

(viii) Perform any other duties, such as reviewing other documents or conducting interviews with staff or colleagues, that the Clinical Supervisor deems necessary to my Clinical Supervision; and

(ix) Submit a written report to the College at the end of the period of Clinical Supervision, or more frequently if the Clinical Supervisor has concerns about my standard of practice.

(c) I, Dr. Sorensen, acknowledge that the observed Laser TURP Procedures shall be selected by the Clinical Supervisor based on the areas of concern identified in the investigation that led to my October 24, 2018 Undertaking, and concerns that may arise during the period of Clinical Supervision.

(d) I, Dr. Sorensen, acknowledge that after the Clinical Supervisor has observed me perform a minimum of three (3) Laser TURP Procedures, if the Clinical Supervisor is satisfied that I have the necessary knowledge, skill and judgment to perform Laser TURP Procedures without supervision, the Clinical Supervisor may recommend to the College that the Clinical Supervision cease.

(e) I, Dr. Sorensen, acknowledge and undertake that the Clinical Supervision will cease only upon recommendation of the Clinical Supervisor and approval by the College.

(f) I, Dr. Sorensen, undertake to cooperate fully with the Clinical Supervision of my practice, conducted under the term of this Undertaking and Appendix “B” to this Undertaking, and to abide by the recommendations of my Clinical Supervisor, including but not limited to, any recommended practice improvements and ongoing professional development.

(g) I, Dr. Sorensen, undertake to ensure that Appendix “B” to this Undertaking is signed and delivered to the College within thirty (30) days of the date I execute this Undertaking.

(h) I, Dr. Sorensen, undertake that if a person who has given an undertaking in Appendix “B” to this Undertaking is unable or unwilling to continue to fulfill its provisions, I shall, within twenty (20) days of receiving notice of same, obtain an executed undertaking in the same form from a similarly qualified person who is acceptable to the College and ensure that it is delivered to the College within that time.

(i) I, Dr. Sorensen, undertake that if I am unable to obtain a Clinical Supervisor on the provisions set out under sections (7)(g) and/or (h) above, I will cease performing any Laser TURP Procedures until such time as I have obtained a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College.

(j) I, Dr. Sorensen, acknowledge that if I am required to cease performing Laser TURP Procedures as a result of section (7)(i) above this will constitute a term, condition or limitation on my certificate of registration and that term, condition or limitation will be included on the public register.

(8) Professional Education

(a) I, Dr. Sorensen, undertake to participate in and successfully complete all of the following professional education (the “Professional Education”):

(i) any professional education recommended by my Clinical Supervisor.

(b) I, Dr. Sorensen, acknowledge that a report or reports may be provided to the College regarding my progress and compliance with the Professional Education.

(9) Monitoring

(a) I, Dr. Sorensen, undertake to inform the College of each and every location at which I practice, delegate, or have privileges, including, but not limited to, any hospitals, clinics, offices, and any Out-of-Hospital Premises and Independent Health Facilities with which I am affiliated, in any jurisdiction (collectively my “Practice Location” or “Practice Locations”), within five (5) days of executing this Undertaking. Going forward, I further undertake to inform the College of any and all new Practice Locations within five (5) days of commencing practice at that location.

(b) I, Dr. Sorensen, undertake that I will submit to, and not interfere with, unannounced inspections of my Practice Locations and patient records by a College representative for the purposes of monitoring my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.

(c) I, Dr. Sorensen, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make appropriate enquiries of OHIP, NMS and/or any person who or institution that may have relevant information, in order for the College to monitor my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.

(d) I, Dr. Sorensen, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP consent form, attached hereto as Appendix “C”.

C. ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

(10) I, Dr. Sorensen, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred to in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

(11) I, Dr. Sorensen, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely responsible for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc. arising from the implementation of any of the provisions of this Undertaking.

(12) I, Dr. Sorensen, acknowledge that I have read and understand the provisions of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal counsel in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my right to do so.

(13) I, Dr. Sorensen, acknowledge that the College will provide this Undertaking to any Chief of Staff, or a colleague with similar responsibilities, at any Practice Location (“Chief of Staff” or “Chiefs of Staff”).

(14) I, Dr. Sorensen, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to the Discipline Committee of the College.

(15) I, Dr. Sorensen, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms, conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the purposes of section 23 of the Code.

(16) Public Register

(a) I, Dr. Sorensen, acknowledge that, during the time period that this Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be posted on the Public Register.

(b) I, Dr. Sorensen, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking being posted in accordance with section (16)(a) above, the following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:

A College investigation was conducted into whether Dr. Sorensen engaged in professional misconduct and/or is incompetent in the practice of urology. As a result of the investigation, Dr. Sorensen agreed to engage in remediation and submit to a reassessment of his practice. As an aspect of the remediation was not completed, he was unable to be assessed in that area. As a result:

Dr. Sorensen will practise under the guidance of a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College.

(c) I, Dr. Sorensen, acknowledge that this Undertaking remains in effect until the College determines its terms are satisfied.

D. CONSENT

(17) I, Dr. Sorensen, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide the following information to any person who requires this information for the purposes of facilitating my completion of the Professional Education and to all Clinical Supervisors, and/or Assessors:

(a) any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking;

(b) any information arising from any investigation into, or assessment of, my practice; and

(c) any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.

(18) I, Dr. Sorensen, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide all Chiefs of Staff with any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.

(19) I, Dr. Sorensen, give my irrevocable consent to any persons who facilitate my completion of the Professional Education, and to all Clinical Supervisors, Chiefs of Staff and Assessors, to disclose to the College, and to one another, any of the following:

(a) any information relevant to this Undertaking;

(b) any information relevant to the provisions of the Clinical Supervisor’s undertaking set out at Appendix “B” to this Undertaking;

(c) any information relevant for the purposes of monitoring my compliance with this Undertaking; and/or

(d) any information which comes to their attention in the course of providing the Professional Education and which they reasonably believe indicates a potential risk of harm to my patients.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Effective December 17, 2021, Dr. Sorensen must cease performing Laser TURP procedures until such time he obtains a College approved Clinical Supervisor

As from November 11, 2021, the following are imposed as terms, conditions and limitations on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Ronald Bjorndahl Sorensen in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Sorensen to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT
(“Undertaking”)

of

DR. RONALD BJORNDAHL SORENSEN
(“Dr. Sorensen”)

to

COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
(the “College”)

A. PREAMBLE

(1) In this Undertaking:

“Code” means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2 to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as amended;

“OHIP” means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan;

“Public Register” means the College’s register that is available to the public.

(2) I, Dr. Sorensen, certificate of registration number 30034, am a member of the College.

(3) I, Dr. Sorensen, acknowledge that following an investigation that raised concerns about my standard of practice in urology, I underwent remediation and submitted to a reassessment of my practice further to an undertaking that I signed on October 24, 2018 (the “October 24, 2018 Undertaking”). I did not complete an aspect of the remediation and was therefore unable to be assessed in that area.

B. UNDERTAKING

(4) I, Dr. Sorensen, undertake to abide by the provisions of this Undertaking, effective immediately.

(5) I, Dr. Sorensen, undertake that during the period of Clinical Supervision set out below, I will only perform Laser Transurethral Resection of the Prostate procedures (Laser TURP Procedures) that have been pre-operatively reviewed and approved by the Clinical Supervisor.

(6) I, Dr. Sorensen, undertake to keep a Log of all Laser TURP Procedures I propose to perform (the “Laser TURP Procedures Log”), in the form attached as set out in Appendix “A”, which will include at least the following information:

(a) the date of the appointment;

(b) the name of the patient and chart/file number;

(c) the clinical indication;

(d) my signature;

(e) the date of the Clinical Supervisor’s review; and

(f) the Clinical Supervisor’s signature.

(7) Clinical Supervision

(a) I, Dr. Sorensen, undertake to practise under the guidance of a clinical supervisor or clinical supervisors acceptable to the College (the “Clinical Supervisor” or “Clinical Supervisors”) on the terms set out below (“Clinical Supervision”). Clinical Supervision shall not end until a minimum of three (3) Laser TURP Procedures have been directly observed by the Clinical Supervisor, as set out in further detail below.

(b) I, Dr. Sorensen, acknowledge that I have reviewed the Clinical Supervisor’s undertaking, attached hereto as Appendix “B”, and understand what is required of the Clinical Supervisor. The Clinical Supervisor will, at minimum:

(i) Review the materials provided by the College and have an orientation session with me, including to discuss the objectives for the Clinical Supervision;

(ii) Pre-operatively review with me any cases in which I propose to perform Laser TURP Procedures. If the Laser TURP Procedure is warranted, the Clinical Supervisor will provide approval to me to proceed with the procedure.

(iii) Sign and date the Laser TURP Procedure Log and each patient chart to confirm that the Clinical Supervisor has reviewed the proposed Laser TURP Procedure and document whether the procedure has been approved;

(iv) Meet with me at my Practice Location, or another location approved by the College, to directly observe me performing a minimum of three (3) Laser TURP Procedures. The Clinical Supervisor’s observation of my performance of these Laser TURP Procedures may be spread out over one (1) or more meetings with me.

(v) Review each patient chart pertaining to the observed Laser TURP Procedures;

(vi) Discuss any concerns arising from the observation and chart reviews;

(vii) Make recommendations to me for practice improvements and ongoing professional development and inquire into my compliance with the recommendations;

(viii) Perform any other duties, such as reviewing other documents or conducting interviews with staff or colleagues, that the Clinical Supervisor deems necessary to my Clinical Supervision; and

(ix) Submit a written report to the College at the end of the period of Clinical Supervision, or more frequently if the Clinical Supervisor has concerns about my standard of practice.

(c) I, Dr. Sorensen, acknowledge that the observed Laser TURP Procedures shall be selected by the Clinical Supervisor based on the areas of concern identified in the investigation that led to my October 24, 2018 Undertaking, and concerns that may arise during the period of Clinical Supervision.

(d) I, Dr. Sorensen, acknowledge that after the Clinical Supervisor has observed me perform a minimum of three (3) Laser TURP Procedures, if the Clinical Supervisor is satisfied that I have the necessary knowledge, skill and judgment to perform Laser TURP Procedures without supervision, the Clinical Supervisor may recommend to the College that the Clinical Supervision cease.

(e) I, Dr. Sorensen, acknowledge and undertake that the Clinical Supervision will cease only upon recommendation of the Clinical Supervisor and approval by the College.

(f) I, Dr. Sorensen, undertake to cooperate fully with the Clinical Supervision of my practice, conducted under the term of this Undertaking and Appendix “B” to this Undertaking, and to abide by the recommendations of my Clinical Supervisor, including but not limited to, any recommended practice improvements and ongoing professional development.

(g) I, Dr. Sorensen, undertake to ensure that Appendix “B” to this Undertaking is signed and delivered to the College within thirty (30) days of the date I execute this Undertaking.

(h) I, Dr. Sorensen, undertake that if a person who has given an undertaking in Appendix “B” to this Undertaking is unable or unwilling to continue to fulfill its provisions, I shall, within twenty (20) days of receiving notice of same, obtain an executed undertaking in the same form from a similarly qualified person who is acceptable to the College and ensure that it is delivered to the College within that time.

(i) I, Dr. Sorensen, undertake that if I am unable to obtain a Clinical Supervisor on the provisions set out under sections (7)(g) and/or (h) above, I will cease performing any Laser TURP Procedures until such time as I have obtained a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College.

(j) I, Dr. Sorensen, acknowledge that if I am required to cease performing Laser TURP Procedures as a result of section (7)(i) above this will constitute a term, condition or limitation on my certificate of registration and that term, condition or limitation will be included on the public register.

(8) Professional Education

(a) I, Dr. Sorensen, undertake to participate in and successfully complete all of the following professional education (the “Professional Education”):

(i) any professional education recommended by my Clinical Supervisor.

(b) I, Dr. Sorensen, acknowledge that a report or reports may be provided to the College regarding my progress and compliance with the Professional Education.

(9) Monitoring

(a) I, Dr. Sorensen, undertake to inform the College of each and every location at which I practice, delegate, or have privileges, including, but not limited to, any hospitals, clinics, offices, and any Out-of-Hospital Premises and Independent Health Facilities with which I am affiliated, in any jurisdiction (collectively my “Practice Location” or “Practice Locations”), within five (5) days of executing this Undertaking. Going forward, I further undertake to inform the College of any and all new Practice Locations within five (5) days of commencing practice at that location.

(b) I, Dr. Sorensen, undertake that I will submit to, and not interfere with, unannounced inspections of my Practice Locations and patient records by a College representative for the purposes of monitoring my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.

(c) I, Dr. Sorensen, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make appropriate enquiries of OHIP, NMS and/or any person who or institution that may have relevant information, in order for the College to monitor my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.

(d) I, Dr. Sorensen, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP consent form, attached hereto as Appendix “C”.

C. ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

(10) I, Dr. Sorensen, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred to in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

(11) I, Dr. Sorensen, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely responsible for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc. arising from the implementation of any of the provisions of this Undertaking.

(12) I, Dr. Sorensen, acknowledge that I have read and understand the provisions of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal counsel in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my right to do so.

(13) I, Dr. Sorensen, acknowledge that the College will provide this Undertaking to any Chief of Staff, or a colleague with similar responsibilities, at any Practice Location (“Chief of Staff” or “Chiefs of Staff”).

(14) I, Dr. Sorensen, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to the Discipline Committee of the College.

(15) I, Dr. Sorensen, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms, conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the purposes of section 23 of the Code.

(16) Public Register

(a) I, Dr. Sorensen, acknowledge that, during the time period that this Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be posted on the Public Register.

(b) I, Dr. Sorensen, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking being posted in accordance with section (16)(a) above, the following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:

A College investigation was conducted into whether Dr. Sorensen engaged in professional misconduct and/or is incompetent in the practice of urology. As a result of the investigation, Dr. Sorensen agreed to engage in remediation and submit to a reassessment of his practice. As an aspect of the remediation was not completed, he was unable to be assessed in that area. As a result:

Dr. Sorensen will practise under the guidance of a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College.

(c) I, Dr. Sorensen, acknowledge that this Undertaking remains in effect until the College determines its terms are satisfied.

D. CONSENT

(17) I, Dr. Sorensen, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide the following information to any person who requires this information for the purposes of facilitating my completion of the Professional Education and to all Clinical Supervisors, and/or Assessors:

(a) any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking;

(b) any information arising from any investigation into, or assessment of, my practice; and

(c) any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.

(18) I, Dr. Sorensen, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide all Chiefs of Staff with any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.

(19) I, Dr. Sorensen, give my irrevocable consent to any persons who facilitate my completion of the Professional Education, and to all Clinical Supervisors, Chiefs of Staff and Assessors, to disclose to the College, and to one another, any of the following:

(a) any information relevant to this Undertaking;

(b) any information relevant to the provisions of the Clinical Supervisor’s undertaking set out at Appendix “B” to this Undertaking;

(c) any information relevant for the purposes of monitoring my compliance with this Undertaking; and/or

(d) any information which comes to their attention in the course of providing the Professional Education and which they reasonably believe indicates a potential risk of harm to my patients.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (5)

Source: Other
Effective Date: 20 Mar 2024
Summary:
Findings of Guilt

Ronald Sorensen was found guilty of the following offence:

1.  Having over 80mg blood alcohol concentration within two hours after ceasing to operate a motor vehicle, contrary to section 320.14(1)(b) of the Criminal Code of Canada.

Date:  March 20, 2024
SENTENCE:  1 Year driving prohibition, Fine of $2,000; Victim fine surcharge of $600; Highway Traffic Act Caution


Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 07 Oct 2022
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:
               
A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed.  A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee.  The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015, or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
 
See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person


Source: Member
Effective Date: 11 Nov 2021
Summary:
A College investigation was conducted into whether Dr. Sorensen engaged in professional misconduct and/or is incompetent in the practice of urology. As a result of the investigation, Dr. Sorensen agreed to engage in remediation and submit to a reassessment of his practice. As an aspect of the remediation was not completed, he was unable to be assessed in that area. As a result:

Dr. Sorensen will practise under the guidance of a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College. 
 


Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 03 Oct 2018
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person. 


Source: FSMB (USA)
Notice Type: External Findings - Other Regulatory Body
Effective Date: 03 Oct 2018
Summary:
Stipulation to Informal Disposition 

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (5)

Source: Other
Effective Date: 20 Mar 2024
Summary:
Findings of Guilt

Ronald Sorensen was found guilty of the following offence:

1.  Having over 80mg blood alcohol concentration within two hours after ceasing to operate a motor vehicle, contrary to section 320.14(1)(b) of the Criminal Code of Canada.

Date:  March 20, 2024
SENTENCE:  1 Year driving prohibition, Fine of $2,000; Victim fine surcharge of $600; Highway Traffic Act Caution


Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 07 Oct 2022
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:
               
A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed.  A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee.  The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015, or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
 
See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person


Source: Member
Effective Date: 11 Nov 2021
Summary:
A College investigation was conducted into whether Dr. Sorensen engaged in professional misconduct and/or is incompetent in the practice of urology. As a result of the investigation, Dr. Sorensen agreed to engage in remediation and submit to a reassessment of his practice. As an aspect of the remediation was not completed, he was unable to be assessed in that area. As a result:

Dr. Sorensen will practise under the guidance of a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College. 
 


Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 03 Oct 2018
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person. 


Source: FSMB (USA)
Notice Type: External Findings - Other Regulatory Body
Effective Date: 03 Oct 2018
Summary:
Stipulation to Informal Disposition 

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1977

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Member. Effective: 17 Dec 2021
Terms and conditions amended by Member. Effective: 11 Nov 2021
Terms and conditions amended by Member. Effective: 24 Oct 2018
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 10 Nov 2017
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Feb 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 21 Jan 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 1978
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1977
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Member.
Date: Effective: 17 Dec 2021

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Member.
Date: Effective: 11 Nov 2021

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Member.
Date: Effective: 24 Oct 2018

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Nov 2017
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Date: Effective: 10 Nov 2017

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Feb 2012

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Jan 2010
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 21 Jan 2010

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Jun 1978

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1977