THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 04:56:32 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Nairobi, 1973
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC, GUJARATI, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI, SWAHILI, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 151 Yonge St
Tia Health - Virtual Clinic
Toronto ON M5C 2W7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 437 266 9242
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1978
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1978
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mahmuda Begum Khan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Sep 2004
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Khan (CPSO#: 30040 )
Business Address: 116 Glen Manor Drive
Toronto Ontario M4E 2X2
(416) 698-0999

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC, GUJARATI, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI, SWAHILI, URDU
Medical School: University of Nairobi, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 151 Yonge St
Tia Health - Virtual Clinic
Toronto ON M5C 2W7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 437 266 9242
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1978
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1978
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mahmuda Begum Khan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Sep 2004
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Khan (CPSO#: 30040 )
Business Address: 116 Glen Manor Drive
Toronto Ontario M4E 2X2
(416) 698-0999

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MAHMUDA BEGUM KHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MAHMUDA BEGUM KHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Nairobi, 1973

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Dec 2019
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 22 May 2019
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1978
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 31 Jan 1975
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Dec 2019

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 May 2019
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 22 May 2019

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Jun 1978

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 31 Jan 1975