THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:51:49 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1977
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ITALIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: suite 404-460 Main Street East
Hamilton Ontario L8N
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-570-0440
Fax: 905-570-0545

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1979
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1979
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. A.R. DeRubeis Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 May 2004
Shareholders:
Dr. A. De Rubeis (CPSO#: 30074 )
Business Address: Walk In Clinic
135 Fennell Avenue West
Hamilton Ontario L9C 0E5
(289) 237-6538
Business Address: 206 Locke St S
Hamilton ON L8P 4B4
905-730-4077

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ITALIAN
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: suite 404-460 Main Street East
Hamilton Ontario L8N
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-570-0440
Fax: 905-570-0545

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1979
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1979
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. A.R. DeRubeis Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 May 2004
Shareholders:
Dr. A. De Rubeis (CPSO#: 30074 )
Business Address: Walk In Clinic
135 Fennell Avenue West
Hamilton Ontario L9C 0E5
(289) 237-6538
Business Address: 206 Locke St S
Hamilton ON L8P 4B4
905-730-4077

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANDREA RITO DE RUBEIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DE RUBEIS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANDREA RITO DE RUBEIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DE RUBEIS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1977

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 1978
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Jun 1978