THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 04:41:48 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1977
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: London Health Sciences Centre
University Hospital
Room C6 116
339 Windermere Road
London Ontario N6A 5A5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 663-3746
Fax: (519) 663-3782

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 02 Dec 1986
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 19 Jun 1985
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 02 1986
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 19 1985
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Mary's General Hospital Kitchener
London Health Sciences Centre London
HOSPITAL: St Mary's General Hospital
LOCATION: Kitchener

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Anthony Tang Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 May 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Tang (CPSO#: 30099 )
Business Address: London Health Sciences Centre
University Hospital
339 Windermere Road
Room C6-109
London Ontario N6A 5A5
(519) 663-3746

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: London Health Sciences Centre
University Hospital
Room C6 116
339 Windermere Road
London Ontario N6A 5A5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 663-3746
Fax: (519) 663-3782

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 02 Dec 1986
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 19 Jun 1985
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 02 1986
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 19 1985
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Mary's General Hospital Kitchener
London Health Sciences Centre London
HOSPITAL: St Mary's General Hospital
LOCATION: Kitchener

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Anthony Tang Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 May 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Tang (CPSO#: 30099 )
Business Address: London Health Sciences Centre
University Hospital
339 Windermere Road
Room C6-109
London Ontario N6A 5A5
(519) 663-3746

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANTHONY SZE-LEUNG TANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TANG is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANTHONY SZE-LEUNG TANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TANG is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 22 Jul 2019
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
 
See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person: 
 

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 22 Jul 2019
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
 
See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person: 
 

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1977

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Oct 2013
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 06 Aug 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Oct 1988
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 1986
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 20 Jul 1982
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Jul 1982
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 1978
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Oct 2013

DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 06 Aug 2008

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Oct 1988

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1986

DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 20 Jul 1982

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Jul 1982

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Jun 1978