THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
19/05/25 04:47:32 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1975
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 36 Hillhurst Blvd
M5N 1N6
Toronto ON M5N 1N6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6478122914
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 13 Nov 1979
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 13 1979
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Saskatchewan

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M. Goldfinger Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Jul 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Goldfinger (CPSO#: 30126 )
Business Address: Canadian Medical Imaging
Suite B1/B7 and B6
600 Sherbourne Street
Toronto Ontario M4X 1W4
(416) 968-1360 Extn: 400
Business Address: 401-18 Hollywood Avenue
Toronto Ontario M2N 6P5
(647) 330-2887

Corporation Name: Goldfinger Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 16 Oct 2018

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 36 Hillhurst Blvd
M5N 1N6
Toronto ON M5N 1N6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6478122914
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 13 Nov 1979
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 13 1979
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Saskatchewan

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M. Goldfinger Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Jul 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Goldfinger (CPSO#: 30126 )
Business Address: Canadian Medical Imaging
Suite B1/B7 and B6
600 Sherbourne Street
Toronto Ontario M4X 1W4
(416) 968-1360 Extn: 400
Business Address: 401-18 Hollywood Avenue
Toronto Ontario M2N 6P5
(647) 330-2887

Corporation Name: Goldfinger Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 16 Oct 2018

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Member
09 Aug 2013
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Member
EFFECTIVE DATE: Aug 09 2013
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon



As from August 9, 2013, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Morris Goldfinger, in
accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Goldfinger to the
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

Dr. Goldfinger has voluntarily relinquished his prescribing privileges
and undertaken not to prescribe any medications whatsoever.


In resolution of the Registrar's investigation of Dr. Morris Goldfinger's
Computed Tomography (CT) diagnostic imaging practice, Dr. Morris Goldfinger
undertakes, as from July 28, 2005, to do the following:

(1) To cease the practice of all CT activities (including conducting CT
radiologic examinations and reading, interpreting, and reporting CT
radiologic examinations) immediately.

(2) Not to recommence any CT practice.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon



As from August 9, 2013, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Morris Goldfinger, in
accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Goldfinger to the
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

Dr. Goldfinger has voluntarily relinquished his prescribing privileges
and undertaken not to prescribe any medications whatsoever.


In resolution of the Registrar's investigation of Dr. Morris Goldfinger's
Computed Tomography (CT) diagnostic imaging practice, Dr. Morris Goldfinger
undertakes, as from July 28, 2005, to do the following:

(1) To cease the practice of all CT activities (including conducting CT
radiologic examinations and reading, interpreting, and reporting CT
radiologic examinations) immediately.

(2) Not to recommence any CT practice.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1975

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Member. Effective: 09 Aug 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 28 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jun 1978
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1975
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Member.
Date: Effective: 09 Aug 2013

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Jul 2005
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 28 Jul 2005

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Jun 1978

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Jun 1975