THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:20:11 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 1977
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: McConnell Medical Centre
Suite 220
820 McConnell Avenue
Cornwall Ontario K6H 4M4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 938-2332
Fax: (613) 938-3172

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Endocrinology and Metabolism
Effective: 04 Sep 1986
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 19 Nov 1985
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Endocrinology and Metabolism
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 04 1986
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 19 1985
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Cornwall Community Hospital Cornwall
HOSPITAL: Cornwall Community Hospital
LOCATION: Cornwall

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J. Paul DeYoung Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Jan 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. J. DeYoung (CPSO#: 30137 )
Business Address: McConnell Medical Centre
Suite 220
820 McConnell Avenue
Cornwall Ontario K6H 4M4
(613) 938-2332

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: McConnell Medical Centre
Suite 220
820 McConnell Avenue
Cornwall Ontario K6H 4M4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 938-2332
Fax: (613) 938-3172

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Endocrinology and Metabolism
Effective: 04 Sep 1986
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 19 Nov 1985
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Endocrinology and Metabolism
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 04 1986
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 19 1985
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Cornwall Community Hospital Cornwall
HOSPITAL: Cornwall Community Hospital
LOCATION: Cornwall

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J. Paul DeYoung Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Jan 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. J. DeYoung (CPSO#: 30137 )
Business Address: McConnell Medical Centre
Suite 220
820 McConnell Avenue
Cornwall Ontario K6H 4M4
(613) 938-2332

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOHN PAUL DEYOUNG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DEYOUNG is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOHN PAUL DEYOUNG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DEYOUNG is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 1977

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 1984
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Effective: 08 Feb 1983
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1978
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Jun 1984

DETAILS: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership
Date: Effective: 08 Feb 1983

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1978