THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
17/05/25 06:53:18 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1977
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Southlake Regional Health Centre
596 Davis Drive
West Bldg, 5th Floor
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 2P9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 895-4521
Extension: 5424
Fax: (905) 830-5987

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 26 Nov 1984
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 26 1984
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
HOSPITAL: Southlake Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Newmarket

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. S. Stokl Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Nov 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Stokl (CPSO#: 30147 )
Business Address: West Building, 5th Floor
865 - 596 Davis Drive
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 2P9
(905) 895-4521 Extn: 5424

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Southlake Regional Health Centre
596 Davis Drive
West Bldg, 5th Floor
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 2P9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 895-4521
Extension: 5424
Fax: (905) 830-5987

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 26 Nov 1984
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 26 1984
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
HOSPITAL: Southlake Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Newmarket

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. S. Stokl Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Nov 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Stokl (CPSO#: 30147 )
Business Address: West Building, 5th Floor
865 - 596 Davis Drive
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 2P9
(905) 895-4521 Extn: 5424

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. STEPHEN BERNARD STOKL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STOKL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. STEPHEN BERNARD STOKL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STOKL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1977

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1978
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1977
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1978

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1977