THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
13/05/25 06:17:41 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1977
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CANTONESE

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 205
4800 Leslie Street
Willowdale Ontario M2J 2K9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 494-3122
Fax: (416) 494-3120

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 18 Nov 1981
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 18 1981
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Edward Gee Jun Jin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Sep 2003
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Jin (CPSO#: 30171 )
Business Address: 205 - 4800 Leslie Street
Toronto Ontario M2J 2K9
(416) 494-3122

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CANTONESE
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 205
4800 Leslie Street
Willowdale Ontario M2J 2K9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 494-3122
Fax: (416) 494-3120

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 18 Nov 1981
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 18 1981
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Edward Gee Jun Jin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Sep 2003
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Jin (CPSO#: 30171 )
Business Address: 205 - 4800 Leslie Street
Toronto Ontario M2J 2K9
(416) 494-3122

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. EDWARD GEE JUN JIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JIN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. EDWARD GEE JUN JIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JIN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1977

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 1978
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1977
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Jul 1978

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1977