THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
24/05/25 04:49:25 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 1973
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: McMaster University
Department of Pediatrics
3N49D
1280 Maint Street West
Hamilton Ontario L8S 4K1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 521-2100
Extension: 75637
Fax: (905) 521-2655

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 07 Mar 1978
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Mar 07 1978
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - California

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: R. M. Issenman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Issenman (CPSO#: 30194 )
Business Address: McMaster University
Department of Pediatrics
3E-25
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton Ontario L8S 4K1
(905) 521-2100 Extn: 75637

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: McMaster University, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: McMaster University
Department of Pediatrics
3N49D
1280 Maint Street West
Hamilton Ontario L8S 4K1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 521-2100
Extension: 75637
Fax: (905) 521-2655

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 07 Mar 1978
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Mar 07 1978
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - California

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: R. M. Issenman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Issenman (CPSO#: 30194 )
Business Address: McMaster University
Department of Pediatrics
3E-25
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton Ontario L8S 4K1
(905) 521-2100 Extn: 75637

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ROBERT MALCOLM ISSENMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ISSENMAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ROBERT MALCOLM ISSENMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ISSENMAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 1973

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 1978
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Jul 1978