THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 05:09:55 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1977
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Albany Medical Clinic
807 Broadview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4K 2P8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 461-9471
Fax: (416) 461-2710

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Toronto East Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: Toronto East Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Philip E. Wong Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Jan 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Wong (CPSO#: 30270 )
Business Address: 807 Broadview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4K 2P8
(416) 461-9471

Corporation Name: Rajani Adno Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 27 May 2010

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Albany Medical Clinic
807 Broadview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4K 2P8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 461-9471
Fax: (416) 461-2710

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Toronto East Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: Toronto East Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Philip E. Wong Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Jan 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Wong (CPSO#: 30270 )
Business Address: 807 Broadview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4K 2P8
(416) 461-9471

Corporation Name: Rajani Adno Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 27 May 2010

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PHILIP ERNEST WONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WONG is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PHILIP ERNEST WONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WONG is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1977

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jul 1978
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 19 Jun 1978
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 1977
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Jul 1978

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 19 Jun 1978

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Jun 1977