THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 04:51:30 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1977
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 201
1 Huron Street
Collingwood Ontario L9Y 1C3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 444-1648
Fax: (705) 444-1909

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 06 Dec 1983
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 08 Jun 1982
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 06 1983
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 08 1982
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Collingwood General and Marine Hospital Collingwood
HOSPITAL: Collingwood General and Marine Hospital
LOCATION: Collingwood

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J. Eric Goode Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 Aug 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Goode (CPSO#: 30451 )
Business Address: 201 - 1 Huron Street
Collingwood Ontario L9Y 1C3
(705) 444-1648

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 201
1 Huron Street
Collingwood Ontario L9Y 1C3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 444-1648
Fax: (705) 444-1909

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 06 Dec 1983
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 08 Jun 1982
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 06 1983
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 08 1982
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Collingwood General and Marine Hospital Collingwood
HOSPITAL: Collingwood General and Marine Hospital
LOCATION: Collingwood

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J. Eric Goode Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 Aug 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Goode (CPSO#: 30451 )
Business Address: 201 - 1 Huron Street
Collingwood Ontario L9Y 1C3
(705) 444-1648

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOHN ERIC GOODE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOODE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOHN ERIC GOODE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOODE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1977

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Oct 1978
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1977
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Oct 1978

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Jun 1977