THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:51:04 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 1976
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 101
605 James Street North
Hamilton Ontario L8L 1J9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 529-8558
Fax: (905) 577-6306

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 04 Aug 1989
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 04 1989
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Owsianik Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Jul 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. W. Owsianik (CPSO#: 30561 )
Business Address: Suite 101
605 James Street North
Hamilton Ontario L8L 1J9
(905) 529-8558

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 101
605 James Street North
Hamilton Ontario L8L 1J9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 529-8558
Fax: (905) 577-6306

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 04 Aug 1989
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 04 1989
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Owsianik Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Jul 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. W. Owsianik (CPSO#: 30561 )
Business Address: Suite 101
605 James Street North
Hamilton Ontario L8L 1J9
(905) 529-8558

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. WALTER DALE JOHN OWSIANIK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OWSIANIK is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. WALTER DALE JOHN OWSIANIK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OWSIANIK is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 1976

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jul 2019
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 04 Oct 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jan 1979
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Jul 2019

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Oct 2017
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 04 Oct 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Jan 1979