THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:52:07 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1977
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Ottawa Hospital Civic Campus
Room 461
737 Parkdale Ave
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 1J8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 798-5555
Extension: 10441
Fax: (613) 761-4692

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Dermatology
Effective: 23 Nov 1983
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Dermatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 23 1983
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Melanie Pratt Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Dec 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Pratt (CPSO#: 30645 )
Business Address: Suite 464
737 Parkdale Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 1J8
(613) 798-5555 Extn: 10443

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Ottawa Hospital Civic Campus
Room 461
737 Parkdale Ave
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 1J8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 798-5555
Extension: 10441
Fax: (613) 761-4692

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Dermatology
Effective: 23 Nov 1983
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Dermatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 23 1983
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Melanie Pratt Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Dec 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Pratt (CPSO#: 30645 )
Business Address: Suite 464
737 Parkdale Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 1J8
(613) 798-5555 Extn: 10443

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MELANIE DAWN PRATT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PRATT is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MELANIE DAWN PRATT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PRATT is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1977

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 1983
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 01 Jul 1979
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1979
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Apr 1979
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jun 1983

DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1979

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1979

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Apr 1979