THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:17:37 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1977
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FINNISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Unit 39
1111 Davis Drive
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 8X2
Business Email: [email protected]
Phone: (905) 898-7221
Fax: (905) 898-2553

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 22 Nov 1982
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 22 1982
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
HOSPITAL: Southlake Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Newmarket

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr.P.Joutsi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Dec 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Joutsi (CPSO#: 30661 )

Corporation Name: Dr. P. Joutsi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 08 Jun 2023

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FINNISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Unit 39
1111 Davis Drive
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 8X2
Business Email: [email protected]
Phone: (905) 898-7221
Fax: (905) 898-2553

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 22 Nov 1982
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 22 1982
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
HOSPITAL: Southlake Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Newmarket

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr.P.Joutsi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Dec 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Joutsi (CPSO#: 30661 )

Corporation Name: Dr. P. Joutsi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 08 Jun 2023

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PENTTI ALFRED JOUTSI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JOUTSI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PENTTI ALFRED JOUTSI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JOUTSI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1977

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Sep 1982
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Sep 1982