THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:49:13 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1978
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 327 Charlotte St
suite 203
Peterborough ON K9J 0B2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 705-775-6870
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Northumberland Hills Hospital
1000 De Palma Drive
Cobourg Ontario K9A 5W6
Phone: (905) 372-6811
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 02 Dec 1985
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 07 Jun 1983
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 02 1985
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 07 1983
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough
HOSPITAL: Peterborough Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Peterborough

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: John N. Reesor Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Reesor (CPSO#: 30775 )
Business Address: 26 Hospital Drive
Peterborough Ontario K9J 7C3
(705) 743-2040
Business Address: Suite 401
327 Charlotte Street
Peterborough Ontario K9J 0B2
(705) 775-6870
Business Address: Northumberland Hills Hospital
1000 DePalma Drive
Cobourg Ontario K9A 5W6
(905) 327-6811
Business Address: Peterborough Regional Health Centre
1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough Ontario K9J 7C6
(705) 743-2121

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 327 Charlotte St
suite 203
Peterborough ON K9J 0B2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 705-775-6870
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Northumberland Hills Hospital
1000 De Palma Drive
Cobourg Ontario K9A 5W6
Phone: (905) 372-6811
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 02 Dec 1985
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 07 Jun 1983
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 02 1985
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 07 1983
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough
HOSPITAL: Peterborough Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Peterborough

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: John N. Reesor Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Reesor (CPSO#: 30775 )
Business Address: 26 Hospital Drive
Peterborough Ontario K9J 7C3
(705) 743-2040
Business Address: Suite 401
327 Charlotte Street
Peterborough Ontario K9J 0B2
(705) 775-6870
Business Address: Northumberland Hills Hospital
1000 DePalma Drive
Cobourg Ontario K9A 5W6
(905) 327-6811
Business Address: Peterborough Regional Health Centre
1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough Ontario K9J 7C6
(705) 743-2121

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOHN NORMAN REESOR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. REESOR is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOHN NORMAN REESOR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. REESOR is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1978

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 1979
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Jun 1979