THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
18/05/25 03:45:29 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1978
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: P O Box 22043
Westmount Postal Outlet
Waterloo Ontario N2L 6J7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 2408975
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 20 Nov 1990
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 20 1990
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Mary's General Hospital Kitchener
Grand River Hospital Corporation Kitchener
HOSPITAL: St Mary's General Hospital
LOCATION: Kitchener

HOSPITAL: Grand River Hospital Corporation
LOCATION: Kitchener

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jerry Rosenblum Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Apr 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Rosenblum (CPSO#: 30839 )
Business Address: P.O Box 22043
Westmount Postal Outlet
Waterloo Ontario N2L 6J7
(519) 240-8975

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: P O Box 22043
Westmount Postal Outlet
Waterloo Ontario N2L 6J7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 2408975
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 20 Nov 1990
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 20 1990
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Mary's General Hospital Kitchener
Grand River Hospital Corporation Kitchener
HOSPITAL: St Mary's General Hospital
LOCATION: Kitchener

HOSPITAL: Grand River Hospital Corporation
LOCATION: Kitchener

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jerry Rosenblum Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Apr 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Rosenblum (CPSO#: 30839 )
Business Address: P.O Box 22043
Westmount Postal Outlet
Waterloo Ontario N2L 6J7
(519) 240-8975

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JERRY HOWARD ROSENBLUM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROSENBLUM is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JERRY HOWARD ROSENBLUM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROSENBLUM is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1978

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 1979
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 22 Jun 1979
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1978
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Jun 1979

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 22 Jun 1979

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Jun 1978