THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
22/05/25 03:45:47 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1969
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 19 Nov 1979
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 19 1979
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: LINDA MORSE MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Dec 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Morse (CPSO#: 30848 )
Business Address: 1604-95 Bronson Ave
Ottawa ON K1R 1E2

Corporation Name: Linda Morse Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 24 Feb 2023

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1969

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 19 Nov 1979
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 19 1979
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: LINDA MORSE MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Dec 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Morse (CPSO#: 30848 )
Business Address: 1604-95 Bronson Ave
Ottawa ON K1R 1E2

Corporation Name: Linda Morse Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 24 Feb 2023

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LINDA ALICE MORSE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MORSE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LINDA ALICE MORSE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MORSE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1969

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 1979
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Jun 1979