THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
26/05/25 03:27:07 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1978
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 130 Bell Farm Road
Unit 1
Barrie Ontario L4M 6J4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705)725-1140
Fax: (705) 725-1710

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1980
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1980
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie
HOSPITAL: Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Barrie

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Brian Morris Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 Jul 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Morris (CPSO#: 30881 )
Business Address: 130 Bell Farm Rd
Suite 1B
Barrie ON L4M 6J4
Business Address: 190 Cundles Road East
Suite 303
Barrie Ontario L4M 4S5
(705) 728-3722

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 130 Bell Farm Road
Unit 1
Barrie Ontario L4M 6J4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705)725-1140
Fax: (705) 725-1710

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1980
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1980
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie
HOSPITAL: Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Barrie

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Brian Morris Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 Jul 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Morris (CPSO#: 30881 )
Business Address: 130 Bell Farm Rd
Suite 1B
Barrie ON L4M 6J4
Business Address: 190 Cundles Road East
Suite 303
Barrie Ontario L4M 4S5
(705) 728-3722

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BRIAN ALEXANDER PERRY MORRIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MORRIS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BRIAN ALEXANDER PERRY MORRIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MORRIS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1978

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1979
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1978
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Jul 1979

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Jun 1978