THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 06:11:20 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1976
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Bingham Memorial Hospital
507 8th Ave
Matheson Ontario P0K 1N0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 273-2424
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Bingham Memorial Hospital Matheson
HOSPITAL: Bingham Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Matheson

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Allen Boettcher Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 Feb 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Boettcher (CPSO#: 30949 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Bingham Memorial Hospital
507 8th Ave
Matheson Ontario P0K 1N0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 273-2424
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Bingham Memorial Hospital Matheson
HOSPITAL: Bingham Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Matheson

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Allen Boettcher Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 Feb 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Boettcher (CPSO#: 30949 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALLEN DAVID BOETTCHER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOETTCHER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALLEN DAVID BOETTCHER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOETTCHER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1976

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 19 Feb 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Feb 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 26 Sep 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 15 Apr 2008
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 13 Jul 1990
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Feb 1988
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 31 Dec 1980
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 1979
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 19 Feb 2010

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Feb 2010

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 26 Sep 2008

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Apr 2008
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 15 Apr 2008

DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 13 Jul 1990

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Feb 1988

DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 31 Dec 1980

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Jul 1979