THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
09/05/25 05:31:27 AM

General Information

Former Name: Mok, Sophia So Yin (Used Until: 18 Jun 1996)
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1978
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CANTONESE, MANDARIN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 213
2000 Credit Valley Road
Mississauga Ontario L5M 4N4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 569-0103
Fax: (905) 569-0104

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Hong Kong S A R

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Sophia Leung Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Jun 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Leung (CPSO#: 31007 )
Business Address: 213 - 2000 Credit Valley Road
Mississauga Ontario L5M 4N4
(905) 569-0103

General Information

Former Name: Mok, Sophia So Yin (Used Until: 18 Jun 1996)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CANTONESE, MANDARIN
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 213
2000 Credit Valley Road
Mississauga Ontario L5M 4N4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 569-0103
Fax: (905) 569-0104

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Hong Kong S A R

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Sophia Leung Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Jun 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Leung (CPSO#: 31007 )
Business Address: 213 - 2000 Credit Valley Road
Mississauga Ontario L5M 4N4
(905) 569-0103

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SOPHIA SO YIN LEUNG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEUNG is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SOPHIA SO YIN LEUNG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEUNG is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1978

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jul 1979
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1978
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Jul 1979

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Jun 1978