THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
10/05/25 05:07:24 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1978
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 107 Leo Moskos Dr
Arnprior Ontario K7S 0G4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 623-3013
Fax: (613) 623-3013

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1980
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1980
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Please contact Dr. Michael Fishman and Dr. Hang Shi at the above.
346 John St N
Arnprior, ON K7S 2P6
T: 613-622-5227
F: 613-622-5228
Date Received: 08 Feb 2018

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mark Robson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 Nov 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Robson (CPSO#: 31050 )
Business Address: 107 Leo Moskos Drive
Arnprior Ontario K7S 0G4
(613) 623-3013

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 107 Leo Moskos Dr
Arnprior Ontario K7S 0G4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 623-3013
Fax: (613) 623-3013

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1980
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1980
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Please contact Dr. Michael Fishman and Dr. Hang Shi at the above.
346 John St N
Arnprior, ON K7S 2P6
T: 613-622-5227
F: 613-622-5228
Date Received: 08 Feb 2018

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mark Robson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 Nov 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Robson (CPSO#: 31050 )
Business Address: 107 Leo Moskos Drive
Arnprior Ontario K7S 0G4
(613) 623-3013

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARK GEORGE ROBSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROBSON is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARK GEORGE ROBSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROBSON is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1978

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Aug 1979
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1978
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Aug 1979

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1978