THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
18/05/25 04:43:15 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1978
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Dr Sol E Sax Medicine Professional Corporation
Suite 402
4 The Kingsway
Etobicoke Ontario M8X 2T1
Business Email: [email protected]
Phone: (416) 234-2060
Fax: (416) 850-5687
Address: 1919 Minnesota Crt
Mississauga ON L5N 0C9
Phone: (905) 858-6299
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 7333 Mississauga Rd
Mississauga ON L5N 6L4
Phone: (905) 819-7203
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Occupational Medicine
Effective: 19 Nov 1990
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1980
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Occupational Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 19 1990
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1980
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: St Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Women's College Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Sol E. Sax Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Aug 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Sax (CPSO#: 31071 )
Business Address: 1333 Tonolli Road
Mississauga Ontario L4Y 4C2
(905) 279-9555
Business Address: 7333 Mississauga Road
Mississauga Ontario L5N 6L4
(905) 819-7203
Business Address: 1919 Minnesota Court
Mississauga Ontario L5N 0C9
(905) 858-6299
Business Address: 600-3700 Steeles Ave W
Woodbridge ON L4L 8K8
Business Address: 402-4 The Kingsway
Etobicoke ON M8X 2T1

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Dr Sol E Sax Medicine Professional Corporation
Suite 402
4 The Kingsway
Etobicoke Ontario M8X 2T1
Business Email: [email protected]
Phone: (416) 234-2060
Fax: (416) 850-5687
Address: 1919 Minnesota Crt
Mississauga ON L5N 0C9
Phone: (905) 858-6299
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 7333 Mississauga Rd
Mississauga ON L5N 6L4
Phone: (905) 819-7203
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Occupational Medicine
Effective: 19 Nov 1990
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1980
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Occupational Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 19 1990
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1980
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: St Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Women's College Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Sol E. Sax Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Aug 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Sax (CPSO#: 31071 )
Business Address: 1333 Tonolli Road
Mississauga Ontario L4Y 4C2
(905) 279-9555
Business Address: 7333 Mississauga Road
Mississauga Ontario L5N 6L4
(905) 819-7203
Business Address: 1919 Minnesota Court
Mississauga Ontario L5N 0C9
(905) 858-6299
Business Address: 600-3700 Steeles Ave W
Woodbridge ON L4L 8K8
Business Address: 402-4 The Kingsway
Etobicoke ON M8X 2T1

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SOLLY ERWIN SAX may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAX is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SOLLY ERWIN SAX may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAX is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1978

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Aug 1979
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1978
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Aug 1979

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Jun 1978