THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
16/05/25 05:13:24 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1977
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CROATIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 115 Midair Ct
Dynacare Home Office
Brampton Ontario L6T 5M3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905 790 3515
Extension: 5399
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 76 Grenville St
Women's College Hospital
Toronto ON M5S 1B2
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Dermatology
Effective: 30 Jun 1994
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Anatomical Pathology
Effective: 30 Nov 1983
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Dermatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1994
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Anatomical Pathology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 30 1983
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Women's College Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Women's College Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. J. Jambrosic Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Nov 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Jambrosic (CPSO#: 31073 )

Corporation Name: Dr. Jadranka Jambrosic Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 27 Dec 2013

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CROATIAN
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 115 Midair Ct
Dynacare Home Office
Brampton Ontario L6T 5M3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905 790 3515
Extension: 5399
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 76 Grenville St
Women's College Hospital
Toronto ON M5S 1B2
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Dermatology
Effective: 30 Jun 1994
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Anatomical Pathology
Effective: 30 Nov 1983
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Dermatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1994
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Anatomical Pathology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 30 1983
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Women's College Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Women's College Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. J. Jambrosic Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Nov 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Jambrosic (CPSO#: 31073 )

Corporation Name: Dr. Jadranka Jambrosic Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 27 Dec 2013

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JADRANKA ADRIANA JAMBROSIC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JAMBROSIC is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JADRANKA ADRIANA JAMBROSIC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JAMBROSIC is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1977

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Aug 1979
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 1979
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 16 Sep 1978
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1977
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Aug 1979

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jan 1979

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 16 Sep 1978

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Jun 1977