THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 09:04:44 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Universidad Nacional Autónoma de México Facultad de Medicina, 1971
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SPANISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 7 Four Winds PL
Dundas ON L9H 3Y1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 08 Nov 1976
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 08 1976
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Auron & Siegel Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 Jun 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Auron (CPSO#: 31115 ) Dr. B. Siegel (CPSO#: 33671 )
Business Address: Suite 202A
1685 Main Street West
Hamilton Ontario L8S 1G5
(905) 527-7990
Business Address: 7 Four Winds Pl
Dundas ON L9H 3Y1
19055277990
Business Address: 7 Four Winds Pl
Dundas ON L9H 3Y1
19055277990

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SPANISH
Medical School: Universidad Nacional Autónoma de México Facultad de Medicina, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 7 Four Winds PL
Dundas ON L9H 3Y1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 08 Nov 1976
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 08 1976
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Auron & Siegel Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 Jun 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Auron (CPSO#: 31115 ) Dr. B. Siegel (CPSO#: 33671 )
Business Address: Suite 202A
1685 Main Street West
Hamilton Ontario L8S 1G5
(905) 527-7990
Business Address: 7 Four Winds Pl
Dundas ON L9H 3Y1
19055277990
Business Address: 7 Four Winds Pl
Dundas ON L9H 3Y1
19055277990

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SAMUEL AURON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AURON is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SAMUEL AURON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AURON is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Universidad Nacional Autónoma de México Facultad de Medicina, 1971

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Aug 1979
First certificate of registration issued: Institutional - Hospital Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Dec 1976
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 31 Aug 1979

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Institutional - Hospital Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Dec 1976