THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
13/05/25 04:26:24 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1978
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CANTONESE

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 302
250 Harding Blvd. West
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 9M7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 883-5580
Fax: (905) 883-7824
Address: Suite 205
330 Highway 7 East
Richmond Hill Ontario L4B 3P8
Phone: (905) 764-8808
Fax: (905) 764-9887

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Respirology
Effective: 18 Nov 1986
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 20 Jun 1985
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Respirology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 18 1986
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 20 1985
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Hong Kong S A R

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Mackenzie Health Richmond Hill
HOSPITAL: Mackenzie Health
LOCATION: Richmond Hill

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: F.L. Liu Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Oct 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Liu (CPSO#: 31223 )
Business Address: Suite 302
250 Harding Boulevard
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 9M7
(905) 883-5580

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CANTONESE
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 302
250 Harding Blvd. West
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 9M7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 883-5580
Fax: (905) 883-7824
Address: Suite 205
330 Highway 7 East
Richmond Hill Ontario L4B 3P8
Phone: (905) 764-8808
Fax: (905) 764-9887

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Respirology
Effective: 18 Nov 1986
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 20 Jun 1985
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Respirology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 18 1986
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 20 1985
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Hong Kong S A R

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Mackenzie Health Richmond Hill
HOSPITAL: Mackenzie Health
LOCATION: Richmond Hill

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: F.L. Liu Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Oct 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Liu (CPSO#: 31223 )
Business Address: Suite 302
250 Harding Boulevard
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 9M7
(905) 883-5580

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LOK-WAN FELIX LIU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LIU is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LOK-WAN FELIX LIU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LIU is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1978

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Nov 1979
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1978
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Nov 1979

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Jun 1978