THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:12:05 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1978
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, GREEK

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 07 Jun 1983
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 07 1983
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Mary's General Hospital Kitchener
Grand River Hospital Corporation Kitchener
HOSPITAL: St Mary's General Hospital
LOCATION: Kitchener

HOSPITAL: Grand River Hospital Corporation
LOCATION: Kitchener

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Nick Tsandelis Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Dec 2005
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Tsandelis (CPSO#: 31274 )
Business Address: 400 Barrington Lane
Waterloo Ontario N2T 1H9
5195908708
Business Address: 6-420 Erb St. W.
Waterloo Ontario N2L6H6
5197421090

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, GREEK
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 07 Jun 1983
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 07 1983
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Mary's General Hospital Kitchener
Grand River Hospital Corporation Kitchener
HOSPITAL: St Mary's General Hospital
LOCATION: Kitchener

HOSPITAL: Grand River Hospital Corporation
LOCATION: Kitchener

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Nick Tsandelis Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Dec 2005
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Tsandelis (CPSO#: 31274 )
Business Address: 400 Barrington Lane
Waterloo Ontario N2T 1H9
5195908708
Business Address: 6-420 Erb St. W.
Waterloo Ontario N2L6H6
5197421090

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NICKOLI TSANDELIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TSANDELIS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NICKOLI TSANDELIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TSANDELIS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (2)

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 17 Jul 2019
Summary:


Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
 

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person: 
 


Member-reported Findings of Malpractice/Professional Negligence
On December 6, 2019, at the Ontario Superior Court of Justice in Kitchener, a finding of Professional Negligence was made against Dr. Nickoli Tsandelis in respect of an incident that took place in April, 2010.
 
 
 

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (2)

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 17 Jul 2019
Summary:


Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
 

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person: 
 


Member-reported Findings of Malpractice/Professional Negligence
On December 6, 2019, at the Ontario Superior Court of Justice in Kitchener, a finding of Professional Negligence was made against Dr. Nickoli Tsandelis in respect of an incident that took place in April, 2010.
 
 
 

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1978

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Dec 1979
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Dec 1979